New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00119
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 17, 2022 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
ALAN WALLACE (1)
Represented By
DAVID BOUCHARD
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
WARREN CARL LIETZ, III
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ANTHONY P TORNTORE
United States Attorney'S Office For The District Of New
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/17/2022 4:01 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to ALAN WALLACE (1). (spc) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
Arrest of ALAN WALLACE in Northern District of Georgia. (spc) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to ALAN WALLACE held on 5/4/2021 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (as, ) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ALAN WALLACE (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/4/2021. (as, ) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY ORDER as to ALAN WALLACE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 5/4/2021. (as, ) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ALAN WALLACE Time excluded from 5/4/2021 until 6/1/2021. pursuant to Standing Order 21-4. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/4/2021. (spc) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
5 5 Rule 5 Documents Received (certified copy of docket) as to ALAN WALLACE (spc) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: WARREN CARL LIETZ, III appearing for ALAN WALLACE (LIETZ, WARREN) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: DAVID BOUCHARD appearing for ALAN WALLACE (BOUCHARD, DAVID) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ALAN WALLACE Time excluded from 6/9/2021 until 8/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/9/2021. (spc) (spc). (spc). [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ALAN WALLACE Time excluded from 7/27/2021 until 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2021. (spc) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
13 13 NOTICE of Unopposed Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to ALAN WALLACE(BOUCHARD, DAVID) [2:21-mj-11073-AME]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
14 14 INFORMATION as to ALAN WALLACE (1) count(s) 1. (jl, )
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ALAN WALLACE. (jl, )
Related: [-]
16 16 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ALAN WALLACE. (jl, )
Related: [-]
17 17 PLEA AGREEMENT as to ALAN WALLACE. (jl, )
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi:Plea Agreement Hearing as to ALAN WALLACE held on 2/15/2022, Plea entered by ALAN WALLACE (1): Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 6/23/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514)) (jl, )
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing For Felony Pleas and/or Sentencings as to ALAN WALLACE. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/15/2022. (jl, )
Related: [-]