Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Amy Totenberg
Case #: 1:22-cv-01055
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2022
Terminated:May 03, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 11, 2022 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff
Imaya Adris
Represented By
Danielle M. Claffey
Kuck Baxter Immigration, Llc -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Ranuka Manamendra
Represented By
Danielle M. Claffey
Kuck Baxter Immigration, Llc -Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/03 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Imaya Adris, Ranuka Manamendra (Claffey, Danielle)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/03 2:25 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (bnw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/03 2:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
9 9 service Return of Service Executed as to USA Mon 04/04 4:46 PM
Return of Service Executed by Imaya Adris, Ranuka Manamendra. Ur Jaddou served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Claffey, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
8 8 service Return of Service Executed as to USA Mon 03/28 11:21 AM
Return of Service Executed by Imaya Adris, Ranuka Manamendra. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/21/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Claffey, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
7 7 notice Certificate of Compliance Fri 03/25 3:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Claffey, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Thu 03/24 10:46 PM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/24/2022. (vs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/16 4:01 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kurt Erskine. (eop)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/16 4:00 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland. (eop)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/16 3:59 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou. (eop)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/16 3:59 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (eop)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint for Mandamus Relief Wed 03/16 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Imaya Adris and Ranuka Manamendra. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11659579)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - A -Copy of I-130 Receipt Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit -B -Copy of Case Status Update,
Att: 3 Exhibit -C -Copy of Posted Processing Times,
Att: 4 Exhibit -D -Plaintiffs Inquires to USCIS,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet