Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04168
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 14, 2022 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ANDREW KAUFMAN
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
4 4 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 9:42 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 03/18 7:07 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Illinois Northern by ANDREW KAUFMAN (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/18 7:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/18 7:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6833967.), filed by ANDREW KAUFMAN. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]