Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04178
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2022
Terminated:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 14, 2022 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PRIOR FREEMAN
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Wed 09/07 1:43 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/7/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 09/01 2:15 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Dismiss (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 08/17 11:07 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by PRIOR FREEMAN. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/31/2022) . (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 03/18 8:29 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - Iowa Southern by PRIOR FREEMAN (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/18 8:28 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/18 8:25 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6834250.), filed by PRIOR FREEMAN. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]