Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:22-cv-00295
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause08:1421-Review of Denial of Application for Naturalization
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2022
Terminated:Feb 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 14, 2022 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
United States Citizenship an Immigration Services
2675 Prosperity Ave
Fairfax, VA 20598
Represented By
Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Petitioner
Marko Pejcic
4831 West Braddock Road 103
Alexandria, VA 22311
Represented By
Ivan Yacub
Yacub Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 23, 2023
20 20 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 02/23 4:54 PM
Clerks Judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in favor of the Respondent, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and against the Petitioner, Marko Pejcic. Signed by Clerk on 02/23/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
19 19 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 02/23 4:44 PM
ORDERED that the Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 9] be, and the same hereby is DENIED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 13] be, and the same hereby is GRANTED and this action DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 02/23/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 10/24 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2022 re9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marko Pejcic, and13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motions argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/07 3:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services. (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
16 16 respm Memorandum in Opposition Mon 09/26 11:56 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Case No. 1:22-CV-295 filed by Marko Pejcic. (Yacub, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
15 15 respm Memorandum in Opposition Tue 09/13 4:53 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services. (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Memorandum in Support Tue 09/13 4:52 PM
Memorandum in Support re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services. (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Tue 09/13 4:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services. (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/08 8:54 AM
ORDER granting11 Consent Motion for a Modification to the Current Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/07/2022. (see order for details) (dvanm)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/08 9:02 AM
Set Deadlines as to Motions for Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (see order12 for details) (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Tue 09/06 2:16 PM
Consent MOTION Modification of Briefing Schedule by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
10 10 respm Memorandum in Support Tue 08/16 9:51 AM
Memorandum in Support re9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment 1:22-cv-00295-AJT-JFA filed by Marko Pejcic. (Yacub, Ivan)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 08/16 8:59 AM
Notice of Correction re9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . The filing user has been notified to file the memorandum in support as a separate document and to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
9 9 motion Summary Judgment Mon 08/15 5:03 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Marko Pejcic.(Yacub, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Marko Pejcic
Friday, July 15, 2022
8 8 notice Notice (other) Fri 07/15 6:38 PM
NOTICE by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services of Submission of Administrative Record(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AR1-24,
Att: 2 AR25-125,
Att: 3 AR126-229,
Att: 4 AR230-309,
Att: 5 AR310-368
Monday, June 27, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/27 4:24 PM
ORDERED that the joint motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant is not required to file a formal answer to plaintiff's petition; it is further ORDERED that defendant will file the pertinent portions of the administrative record of proceedings before USCIS on or before July 15, 2022. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 06/27/2022. (see order for details) (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Thu 06/23 1:50 PM
Joint MOTION Entry of Briefing Schedule by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/14 9:32 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Citizenship an Immigration Services answer due 6/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/14/2022. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 06/13 9:35 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by United States Citizenship an Immigration Services.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 03/29 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship an Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Monday, March 28, 2022
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 03/28 11:41 AM
Proposed Summons by Marko Pejcic.(Yacub, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Summons Attorney General,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Summons US State Attorney
Monday, March 21, 2022
misc Notice of Correction Mon 03/21 1:20 PM
Notice of Correction re1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to refile the summons as a separate entry (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/18 3:00 PM
Complaint 1:22-cv-00295 Pejcic v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8300404.), filed by Marko Pejcic.(Yacub, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Summons US Attorney,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Summons Attorney General,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Summons USCIS
utility Initial Case Assignment Mon 03/21 1:23 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
Related: [-]