Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Paul M Warner
Case #: 2:14-cv-00618
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2014
Terminated:Feb 11, 2016
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 7:42 PM MDT
Defendant
Quinn Jay Adamson
Represented By
Kasey L. Wright
Hansen Wright Eddy & Haws
contact info
Defendant
American Fork Police Department
Represented By
Kasey L. Wright
Hansen Wright Eddy & Haws
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Julie Castellano
PO BOX 1142
AMERICAN FORK, UT 84003
Represented By
Stephen G. Tryon
Ayres Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
utility Case No Longer Referred Tue 02/23 2:04 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. (srs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/11 9:06 AM
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for failure to prosecute. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/10/2016. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
22 22 order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/14 8:28 AM
IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days in which to show cause why his case should not be dismissed because she failed to comply with the Court's June 22, 2015 Order to file notice of pro se or attorney representation and to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/9/2015. (kpf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
21 21 misc Request to Submit for Decision Wed 10/14 1:35 PM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re20 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 16(f) for Failure to Comply with Court Order Dated 22 June 2015 filed by Defendants Quinn Jay Adamson, American Fork Police Department. (Wright, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 08/28 4:31 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 16(f) for Failure to Comply with Court Order Dated 22 June 2015 filed by Defendant Quinn Jay Adamson. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Wright, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 22, 2015
19 19 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 06/23 11:40 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tyler B. Ayres and Stephen G. Tryon withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/22/2015. (las)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/22 10:20 AM
NOTICE of to Appoint or Appear by Quinn Jay Adamson, American Fork Police Department (Wright, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 06/17 11:35 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Julie Castellano. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Ayres, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 06/17 11:01 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Julie Castellano. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner. Attorney Tyler B. Ayres added to party Julie Castellano(pty:pla)(Ayres, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2015
15 15 order Order Fri 03/20 3:25 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes arising after this date. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 3/20/2015. (jds)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2015
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/06 11:07 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 5/29/2015. Discovery due by 2/16/2016. Motions due by 3/15/2016. Status Conference set for 3/22/2016 at 02:00 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 3/6/2015. (las)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
13 13 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/13 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quinn Jay Adamson, American Fork Police Department Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Wright, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
12 12 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Tue 02/10 11:06 AM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Tryon, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 08, 2015
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/08 3:45 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint filed by Quinn Jay Adamson, American Fork Police Department. Attorney Kasey L. Wright added to party Quinn Jay Adamson(pty:dft), Attorney Kasey L. Wright added to party American Fork Police Department(pty:dft)(Wright, Kasey)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 07, 2014
10 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quinn Jay Adamson with Jury Demand. New Defendants: John Does 1-8, American Fork Police Department. , filed by Julie Castellano. (Tryon, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 05, 2014
9 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quinn Jay Adamson, filed by Julie Castellano. (las)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 08, 2014
8 8 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 5 Motion for Service of Process. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements set forth in the above-referenced authorities on or before November 7, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/8/2014. (las)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 10, 2014
7 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/10/2014. (las) Modified on 9/11/2014 changed type of referral from (b)(1)(A) to (b)(1)(B) (las).
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
6 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Julie Castellano (las)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
5 5 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Quinn Jay Adamson filed by Plaintiff Julie Castellano.(eat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Julie Castellano. (eat)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT against Quinn Jay Adamson (Originally received by the court on 8/25/2014). (Fee Status: IFP), filed by Julie Castellano. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (eat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet 1
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/29/2014. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2014
1 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Julie Castellano. (eat)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 8/25/2014