Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04381
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 17, 2022 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
2345 Rice Street Suite 230
Roseville, MN 55113
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
RODERICK HENDERSON
Represented By
BRENT WAYNE COON
Brent Coon & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/29 8:39 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: A REMINDER ALL party names should be entered using ALL CAPS and no punctuation. Clerk will correct party names. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/28 7:29 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6868642.), filed by Roderick Henderson. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
misc Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case Wed 03/23 5:36 PM
Payment of Filing Fee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6856060), filed by Roderick Henderson. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]