Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:22-cv-00441
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2022
Terminated:Jun 29, 2023
Case in other court:Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2022-001549
Last checked: Saturday Sep 17, 2022 2:35 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Highland Cabinetry Incorporated
Represented By
Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Pavneet Singh Uppal
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Counter Defendant
Daniel Kotora
Represented By
Troy Patrick Foster
Foster Group PLLC
contact info
Haley Richelle Carr
Foster Group Pllc - Mcdowell Rd., Phoenix
contact info
Megan Nicole Weides
Foster Group Pllc - Mcdowell Rd., Phoenix
contact info
Defendant
Highland Cabinetry Incorporated
Represented By
Kristina Willenborg Leonhardt
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Pavneet Singh Uppal
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kotora
Represented By
Troy Patrick Foster
Foster Group PLLC
contact info
Haley Richelle Carr
Foster Group Pllc - Mcdowell Rd., Phoenix
contact info
Megan Nicole Weides
Foster Group Pllc - Mcdowell Rd., Phoenix
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, July 07, 2023
46 46 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims Fri 07/07 4:30 PM
ORDER: This case was dismissed on June 29, 2023. (Doc.44 .) Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to dismiss claims and counterclaims with prejudice (Doc.45 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/7/23. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
45 45 motion Dismiss Counts/Claims Wed 07/05 12:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice by Daniel Kotora.(Foster, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 29, 2023
44 44 order Clerks Judgment Thu 06/29 9:45 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Notice of Settlement and the Court's Orders filed February 27, 2023 and April 27, 2023, this action is dismissed. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
43 43 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/27 1:35 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion (Doc.42 ) is granted. The deadline for a party to file a request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is extended to June 27, 2023. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/27/23. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
42 42 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/26 7:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend deadline to dismiss by Daniel Kotora. (Foster, Troy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
41 41 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Mon 02/27 2:22 PM
ORDER: The Court having received notice that this case has settled (Doc.40 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, DISMISS this entire case on April 27, 2023, and shall enter judgment accordingly, unless prior thereto a party files a request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all deadlines and hearings are vacated and that all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/27/23. (MAW)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 02/27 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated. (Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
39 39 order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 12/08 10:01 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulations (Docs.37 ,38 ) are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for expert disclosures for the party with the burden of proof is extended to March 10, 2023, for the responding party to April 28, 2023, and for rebuttal experts to May 26, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the settlement conference set before Magistrate Judge Willett on December 19, 2022 is vacated. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/8/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
38 38 misc Stipulation Wed 12/07 4:04 PM
STIPULATION re:34 Order on Stipulation,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Hearings, by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
37 37 misc Stipulation Tue 12/06 10:48 AM
STIPULATION re:23 Scheduling Order by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2022
36 36 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 11/07 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Kotora.(Foster, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs First Supplemental Disclosure Statement
Friday, September 30, 2022
35 35 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 09/30 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Kotora. (Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/23 1:19 PM
ORDER granting33 Stipulation for Continuance of Settlement Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED continuing Telephonic Settlement Conference from October 3, 2022 to December 19, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Willett. The remainder of the Order Setting Telephonic Settlement Conference (Doc.27 ) is affirmed. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/23/2022. (WLP)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation Fri 09/23 9:47 AM
STIPULATION re:27 Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Continuance of Settlement Conference by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated, Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Tue 08/09 2:08 PM
ANSWER to31 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM RE-FILED against Highland Cabinetry Incorporated, Highland Cabinetry Incorporated by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated, Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
31 31 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/28 1:07 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Highland Cabinetry Incorporated filed by Daniel Kotora. (SST)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 07/28 1:01 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation for leave to file amended complaint (Doc.28 ) is denied as moot because, pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b), leave of Court is not needed when filing an amended pleading with the opposing party's written consent. The Court will construe the stipulation as the notice of filing required by LRCiv 15.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the lodged amended complaint (Doc.29 ). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/28/22. (SST)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/26 5:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Daniel Kotora.(Foster, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2
28 28 misc Stipulation Tue 07/26 1:11 PM
STIPULATION for Leave to Amend by Daniel Kotora.(Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
27 27 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 07/20 11:26 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - A Telephonic Settlement Conference shall be held before United States Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on October 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff and the Plaintiff shall appear telephonically at the Settlement Conference set on October 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the Defendant and the Defendant's representative shall appear telephonically at the Settlement Conference set on October 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/19/2022. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
26 26 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/19 5:21 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/19/2022. The settlement Magistrate Judge and counsel discussed the status of this case and the settlement Magistrate Judge's process for conducting settlement conferences. Counsel agree that a settlement conference as discussed would be helpful for resolution of the case. IT IS ORDERED setting a telephonic settlement conference for October 3, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall email to Chambers a confidential settlement memorandum and ground rules, as well as participate in two rounds of offers as set forth in the Order to follow. Conference held 3:00 PM to 3:20 PM. A court reporter was not present, nor was the conference electronically recorded. (MRH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/11 12:07 PM
ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference to discuss scheduling a Settlement Conference for July 18, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 7/11/2022. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 07/07 10:48 AM
ORDER: At the request of the parties as reflected in the Joint Case Management Report (Doc.21 ), and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' request. Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett having been randomly drawn, IT IS ORDERED referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Willett for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to contact said chambers within 14 days of the date of this Order to schedule a hearing date and time. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/7/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/07 10:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/23/2023 . Dispositive motions due by 8/25/2023 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/7/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Thu 07/07 10:33 AM
ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc.21 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 12 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/7/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
21 21 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Tue 07/05 6:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Daniel Kotora. (Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
20 20 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 06/14 4:16 PM
Plaintiff's/Counterdefendant's ANSWER to16 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Highland Cabinetry Incorporated by Daniel Kotora.(Foster, Troy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
19 19 order Order on Stipulation Thu 06/09 5:29 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Deadlines (Doc.18 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have until June 17, 2022 to file their respective answers to counterclaims. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/9/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 06/09 4:04 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Counterclaims by Daniel Kotora.(Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, June 06, 2022
17 17 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 06/06 9:31 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than July 5, 2022 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/6/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 06/03 6:37 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Daniel Kotora by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
15 15 order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/26 4:47 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED parties' joint stipulation to extend time (Doc.14 ) is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint by June 3, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/26/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Thu 05/26 3:01 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:11 Amended Complaint by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 12, 2022
13 13 order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/12 5:12 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation to extend time for defendant to respond to first amended complaint (Doc.12 ) is granted. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond by May 27, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/12/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Thu 05/12 10:14 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:11 Amended Complaint (First) by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 28, 2022
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/28 9:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Highland Cabinetry Incorporated filed by Daniel Kotora.(Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit EEOC RTS
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/28 9:03 PM
NOTICE re: Filing Amended Complaint by Daniel Kotora .(Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Exhibit EEOC RTS
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Thu 04/28 8:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Nicole Weides on behalf of Daniel Kotora. (Weides, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
8 8 order Order on Stipulation Mon 03/28 11:31 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint (Doc.6 ) is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 29, 2022. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/28/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order Mon 03/28 10:25 AM
PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/28/22. (MAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
6 6 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Fri 03/25 5:23 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re:1 Notice of Removal, by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated.(Leonhardt, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/22 4:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated. (Uppal, Pavneet)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/22 8:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Highland Cabinetry Incorporated. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
5 5 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 03/24 9:41 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Highland Cabinetry Incorporated. *State Documents were not submitting during opening. Clerical error. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Tue 03/22 8:31 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20469007. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-441-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/22 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-001549. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20469007 filed by Highland Cabinetry Incorporated. (Uppal, Pavneet)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded); CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION upon Michael Warren, Statutory Agent authorized to receive service on behalf of Highland Cabinetry Incorporated on 2/18/2022. (Original filed at Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/24/2022). (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Tue 03/22 8:30 AM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded); CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION upon Michael Warren, Statutory Agent authorized to receive service on behalf of Highland Cabinetry Incorporated on 2/18/2022. (Original filed at Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/24/2022). (MCO)
Related: [-]