Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: J Elizabeth Mcbath
Case #: 1:22-cv-01145
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2022
Terminated:Dec 22, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 18, 2022 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jill M. Harrison
Ford & Harrison Llp-Atl
contact info
Kadale Lubin
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eric Lewis
Represented By
Jill M. Harrison
Ford & Harrison Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Kashana Lassiter
Represented By
James Metzger McCabe
The Mccabe Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Samuel Graham White
The Mccabe Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Thursday, December 22, 2022
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 12/22 11:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (gas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/22 11:15 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath terminated from case. (gas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/21 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Kashana Lassiter. (McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 10/20 3:18 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Mediation18 . The case shall be STAYED for sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, through and including December 19, 2022. Additionally, all pre-trial deadlines and the deadline for dispositive motions shall be extended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 10/20/2022. (gas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
18 18 motion Stay Tue 10/11 3:55 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Mediation by Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C., Eric Lewis.(Harrison, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
17 17 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 09/21 11:28 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 09/21/2022. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
16 16 motion Protective Order Fri 09/16 4:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Amended Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Kashana Lassiter.(McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 09/16 2:31 PM
ORDER denying without Prejudice14 Motion for Protective Order. The parties are DIRECTED to resubmit to the undersigned a revised consent protective order containing one of these two proposed paragraphs for consideration and approval by the Court Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 09/16/2022. (jkb) Modified on 9/16/2022 (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
14 14 motion Protective Order Tue 09/13 12:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Kashana Lassiter.(White, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 15, 2022
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Fri 07/15 9:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C., Eric Lewis.(Harrison, Jill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/28 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 06/28/2022. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
11 11 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 06/20 5:30 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kashana Lassiter. (McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 06/16 8:43 AM
Submission of9 Order on Motion to Stay,, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 05/25 3:16 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C., Eric Lewis.(Harrison, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 05/16 1:36 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Stay. All applicable deadlines are hereby stayed until thirty (30) days from such time as Defendant Eric Lewis files an answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Prior to the expiration of this stay, the Parties are hereby ordered to provide the Court with a Rule 26(f) report and proposed scheduling order encompassing both Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 05/16/2022. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
8 8 motion Stay Tue 05/10 3:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Kashana Lassiter.(White, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/04 3:17 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Eric Lewis. (jkb)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons Wed 05/04 2:56 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kashana Lassiter Proposed Summons as to Defendant Eric Lewis (McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/04 2:33 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C., Eric Lewiswith Jury Demand filed by Kashana Lassiter.(McCabe, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 04/22 4:40 PM
Clerks Notation re:4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 04/22/2022. (cmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 04/21 3:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent AL TPA, LLC for Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C.. (Harrison, Jill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/13 8:34 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C.. Discovery ends on 9/12/2022.(Harrison, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/04 12:09 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-01145-SDG-JEM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/22 1:12 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Independent Administrative Services, L.L.C.. (eop)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/22 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kashana Lassiter. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11674686)(eop)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet