Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04593
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 20, 2022 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RUBEN BENAVIDES
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Friday, May 05, 2023
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/09 11:23 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 03/24 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum Southern District of California by RUBEN BENAVIDES (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/24 10:04 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/24 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6857701.), filed by RUBEN BENAVIDES. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]