Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:22-cv-00342
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 20, 2022 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By
Zachary Andrew McEntyre
King And Spalding Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Allison Hill White
King And Spalding Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Jeffrey S. Russell
Bryan Cave Llp - St Louis
contact info
Jeffrey Cashdan
King And Spalding Llp - Atlanta
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
King And Spalding Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Julia Constance Barrett
King And Spalding Llp - Austin
contact info
Plaintiff
Lillian Bartee
Represented By
Andrew Shamis
Shamis And Gentile Pa - Miami
contact info
Joseph Henry Bates, III
Carney And Bates PLLC
contact info
Christopher Chagas Gold
Edelsberg Law PA
contact info
Scott Adam Edelsberg
Edelsberg Law PA
contact info
Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Carney And Bates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
174 174 minutes In Court Hearing Thu 04/17 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: In Court Hearing held on 4/17/2025. The parties are present for a hearing regarding class certification. The Court hears arguments from counsel and takes the matter under submission. (Court Reporter:Pamela Harrison, Pamela_Harrison@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7987) (proceedings started: 1:06 PM) (proceedings ended: 2:04 PM) (Deputy Clerk: B. Porter)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Joshua Jacobson, Jacob Phillips)(Appearance for Defendant: James Matthew Brigman, Seth Euster, Jeffrey Russell, Allison White) (BRP)
Related: [-]
173 173 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 04/17 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Lillian Bartee, Lisa Bledsoe.(TMT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Additional Supplemental Authority
172 172 order A Docket Text Order Thu 04/17 12:47 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' unopposed Motions for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, Docs.161 and163 , are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 4/17/2025. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
171 171 motion Leave to Wed 04/16 2:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to FILE NOTICE OF FURTHER SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Plaintiffs Lillian Bartee, Lisa Bledsoe.(Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER