Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:22-cv-00761
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 20, 2022 3:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Gary Acosta
Defendant
Ernest Boudreaux
Defendant
Paul Champagne
Defendant
Lockport Town Council
Defendant
Tyler Detillier
Defendant
Rodney Hartman
Defendant
Bobbie M. Galjour
Defendant
Lockport Town
Defendant
Christopher John Huddleston
Plaintiff
Edward Reinhardt
Represented By
Brent Paul Abadie
Brent P. Abadie, Atty At Law
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2024
onna Phillips Currault on 9/26/2024. (alm)ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Contempt of Court and Sanctions is DENIED and the Motion to Enforce Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT for the reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge D

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 26, 2024
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Order on Motion for Sanctions Thu 09/26 3:14 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's28 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Contempt of Court and Sanctions is DENIED and the Motion to Enforce Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT for the reasons stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/26/2024. (alm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
34 34 respm Supplemental Memorandum Mon 09/23 3:24 PM
Supplemental Memorandum in Response to28 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court, Second MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement, First MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement filed by Gary Acosta. (Detweiler, Keith) Modified text on 9/23/2024 (go)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
33 33 respm Supplemental Memorandum Fri 09/20 3:28 PM
Reply filed by Edward Reinhardt to28 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court, Second MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement ,First MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement Agreement . (Abadie, Brent) Modified text on 9/20/2024 (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
32 32 minutes Status Conference Thu 09/19 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Status Conference held on 9/19/2024. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff file a supplemental memoramdum by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, September 20, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file a supplemental memorandum by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, September 23, 2024. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Fri 09/13 5:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING28 MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court filed by Edward Reinhardt. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 9/13/2024.(clc)(NEF: MJ2)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/13 2:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Gary Acosta re28 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court Second MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement First MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement . (Detweiler, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
29 29 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 08/21 10:44 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re28 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court Second MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement First MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement . * Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Filing attorney should have entered Submission Date and selected the correct hearing Judge. Clerktook corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/19/2024 before Judge Barry Ashe. No further action is necessary.* (clc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
28 28 motion Attorney Fees Enforce Judgment Sanctions Tue 08/20 4:09 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court , Second MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement , First MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement by Edward Reinhardt. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/19/2024.(Abadie, Brent) Modified on 8/21/2024 (clc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Friday, August 16, 2024
27 27 motion Settlement Enforce Judgment Attorney Fees Sanctions Fri 08/16 3:36 PM
Second MOTION for Settlement To Enforce Settlement , First MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Sign Settlement Agreement , First MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Contempt of Court , MOTION for Sanctions for Refusing to Sign Settlement by Edward Reinhardt. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/16/2024.(Abadie, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order for Hearing
Monday, March 11, 2024
26 26 minutes Status Conference Mon 03/11 1:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Status Conference held on 3/11/2024. The parties requested a status conference with the court to assist with certain language in the settlement document memorializing the terms of the August 14, 2023 settlement. After discussion, the parties agreed on acceptable language. Settlement documents will be executed within 14 days. (alm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/08 1:16 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Set Status Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference with Magistrate Currault is hereby set for March 11, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 3/8/2024. (alm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/07 12:29 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Set Status Conference by Lockport Town. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault.(Detweiler, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 05, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 02/05 5:41 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Keith M. Detweiler for Defendants. Attorney J. Scott Thomas terminated Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/5/2024. (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 02/02 3:17 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw J. Scott Thomas as Attorney and Substitute Counsel Keith Detweiler by Lockport Town.Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Lockport Town(pty:dft).(Detweiler, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 25, 2024
21 21 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Thu 01/25 11:36 AM
**DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Gary Acosta, Ernest Boudreaux, Paul Champagne, Tyler Detillier, Bobbie M. Galjour, Rodney Hartman, Christopher John Huddleston, Lockport Town, Lockport Town Council.Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Gary Acosta(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Ernest Boudreaux(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Paul Champagne(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Tyler Detillier(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Bobbie M. Galjour(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Rodney Hartman(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Christopher John Huddleston(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Lockport Town(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M. Detweiler added to party Lockport Town Council(pty:dft).(Detweiler, Keith) Modified on 1/25/2024 (am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 07, 2023
20 20 misc Transcript Thu 09/07 9:24 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Conference held on August 14, 2023 before Judge Donna Currault. Court Reporter/Recorder Chambers Recording, Telephone number 504-589-7724. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2023. (daf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/15 9:52 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the action be and it is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if the settlement is not consummated within 60 days or such other time as is reasonable. The Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/14/2023.(am)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
18 18 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 08/14 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Settlement Conference held on 8/14/2023. A settlement conference was conducted on this date before the undersigned magistrate judge. After extensive settlement discussions with the parties and counsel, the court was advised that a settlement has been reached. The material terms of settlement were recited on the court record, and all parties and their counsel confirmed their agreement to same. By copy of this minute entry, Judge Ashe is advised so that he may enter an appropriate 60-day conditional dismissal order. (cg)(cc:Hon. Barry W. Ashe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order Set Hearings Terminate Hearings Tue 06/13 4:01 PM
ORDER: At the joint request of counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the Settlement Conference previously scheduled for August 3, 2023, is hereby rescheduled to MONDAY, AUGUST 14, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. At least two (2) full business days before the conference, each party shall provide a confidential, concise position letter or memorandum no longer than four (4) pages double-spaced, to Chambers via email. It is the duty of the parties to notify my Chambers if this case is continued, settled, or otherwise disposed of prior to the date of the scheduled settlement conference. This settlement conference will be conducted via video-conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/13/2023. (NEF: Sec M) (rt)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Set Hearings Tue 06/13 8:45 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a Settlement Conference is scheduled for THURSDAY, AUGUST 3, 2023, at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. At least two (2) full business days before the conference, each party shall provide a confidential, concise position letter or memorandum no longer than four (4) pages double-spaced, to Chambers via email. It is the duty of the parties to notify my Chambers if this case is continued, settled, or otherwise disposed of prior to the date of the scheduled settlement conference. This settlement conference will be conducted via video-conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/12/2023. (NEF: Sec M) (rt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/02 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Scheduling Conference was held by telephone on February 1, 2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Bench Trial set for 11/6/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 10/6/2023. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/02/2023.(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/17 2:15 PM
ORDER: GRANTING13 MOTION to Continue and Re-set Trial and Pre-Trial Conference Dates . Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2023 11:00 AM, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/17/2023.(am)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Continue Tue 01/17 11:38 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue and Re-set Trial and Pre-Trial Conference Dates by Gary Acosta, Ernest Boudreaux, Paul Champagne, Tyler Detillier, Bobbie M. Galjour, Rodney Hartman, Christopher John Huddleston, Lockport Town, Lockport Town Council.(Thomas, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 23, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 12/23 11:14 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/2022.(lag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12/20/22 Order,
Att: 2 Case List
Monday, November 21, 2022
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/21 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/31/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Bench Trial reset for 6/19/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 5/12/2023. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/21/2022.(clc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/12 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2022 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
9 9 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 10/07 10:06 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , ANSWER to1 Complaint,8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Gary Acosta, Ernest Boudreaux, Paul Champagne, Tyler Detillier, Bobbie M. Galjour, Rodney Hartman, Christopher John Huddleston, Lockport Town, Lockport Town Council.Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Gary Acosta(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Ernest Boudreaux(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Paul Champagne(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Tyler Detillier(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Bobbie M. Galjour(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Rodney Hartman(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Christopher John Huddleston(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Lockport Town(pty:dft), Attorney J. Scott Thomas added to party Lockport Town Council(pty:dft).(Thomas, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/09 10:25 AM
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT against Gary Acosta, Ernest Boudreaux, Paul Champagne, Tyler Detillier, Bobbie M. Galjour, Rodney Hartman, Christopher John Huddleston, Lockport Town, Lockport Town Council filed by Edward Reinhardt.(am)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 08/09 10:22 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 08/09/2022. (am)
Related: [-]
misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 08/09 9:09 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re3 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint . **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
Related: [-]
misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 08/09 9:11 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Amended Complaint. **Document marked as filed in error, should have been attached to rec. doc. 3 as a proposed pleading. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
4 4 5 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/08 5:49 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Edward Reinhardt.(Abadie, Brent)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs motion Leave to File Document Mon 08/08 5:22 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Edward Reinhardt. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas.(Abadie, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 24, 2022
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/24 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9289521) filed by Edward Glen Reinhardt.Attorney Brent Paul Abadie added to party Edward Glen Reinhardt(pty:pla).(Abadie, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 03/24 3:18 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
Related: [-]