New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:22-cv-01664
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Union County Superior Court, UNN-L-000120-22
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 20, 2022 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
ALEXANDER STEARLY CARMICHAEL
Finazzo Cossolini O'Lery Meola & Hager, LLC
contact info
JEREMIAH L. O'LEARY
Finazzo Cossolini O'Leary Meola & Hager, LLC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV JACK GLANZBERG
Plaintiff
2229 MORRIS AVE REALTY LLC
Represented By
THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Bergwall & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
2231 MORRIS AVE REALTY LLC
Represented By
THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Bergwall & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
2235 MORRIS AVE REALTY LLC
Represented By
THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Bergwall & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
G.E.M.S. PARTNERS LLC
Represented By
THOMAS P. BERGWALL
Bergwall & Associates, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 29 2024
OPINION AND ORDER denying 34 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 7/29/2024. (jd, )

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
53 53 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Tue 11/26 1:01 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 11/26/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
52 52 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 11/26 11:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (SIPPLE, BRANDON)
Related: [-]