Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 3:22-cr-00032
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Last checked: Friday Mar 25, 2022 3:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Johnathan Dale Stump (1)
Represented By
Cheryll A Bennett
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Andrew Saunders
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO May 09 2022
ORDER sustaining 21 Motion to Revoke as to Johnathan Dale Stump (1) and Releasing Defendant from Custody to Report to Nova House for Inpatient Treatment. Defendant Johnathan Dale Stump is to be released from the Butler County Jail on May 11, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. to a member of the United States Marshals Service to be transported to the United States Pretrial Services Office at the Dayton Federal Courthouse. Defendant is to then be transported by Belinda Fowler, whose phone number is 937-536-5782, to report directly to Nova House for inpatient residential treatment. He is to arrive at the Nova House in ample time for his10:00 a.m. intake procedure. Upon release from inpatient treatment, defendant shall immediately contact United States Pretrial Services Officer, LeRae Anthony. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 05/09/2022. (tp)

Docket last updated: 03/25/2022 4:32 AM EDT
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Johnathan Dale Stump (1). (pb) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Johnathan Dale Stump. (pb) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Johnathan Dale Stump (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/25/22. (pb) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr via GTM: Initial Appearance as to Johnathan Dale Stump held on 1/28/2022; AUSA Ryan Saunders appeared on behalf of the Government; Defendant consented to proceeding by video; Defendant is unable to afford counsel; AFPD Cheryll A Bennett is appointed for Johnathan Dale Stump; Criminal Rule 5(f) Statement by the Court; the Government is moving for pretrial detention; Detention Hearing set for 2/2/2022 at 9:30 AM via GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain Jr.; Preliminary Hearing set for 2/11/2022 at 11:00 AM via GoToMeeting before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain Jr.; Defendant is remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Related [+] (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: 1:31-1:37
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Johnathan Dale Stump. (Saunders, Ryan) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Johnathan Dale Stump. (Saunders, Ryan) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Johnathan Dale Stump (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/28/22. (pb) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Johnathan Dale Stump. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/28/22. (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Johnathan Dale Stump. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/28/22. (rp) Modified on 1/31/2022 (rp). [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order Regarding Use Of Video Teleconferencing as to Johnathan Dale Stump. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/28/22. (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
11 11 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Johnathan Dale Stump. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/28/22. (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/27/22 in case as to Johnathan Dale Stump. (pb) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr via GTM: Detention Hearing as to Johnathan Dale Stump held on 2/2/2022; AUSA Ryan Saunders appeared on behalf of the Government; Defendant appeared with AFPD Thomas Anderson; AFPD Thomas Anderson appeared in AFPD Cheryll Bennett's stead; Defendant consented to proceeding by video; argument held; Court makes a statement and finding; the Government's5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention is GRANTED; the Defendant is ordered detained pretrial without a bond; Defendant shall remain in custody. Related [+] (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: 9:31-9:43
Friday, February 11, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr via GTM: AUSA Ryan Saunders appeared on behalf of the Government; AFPD Arthur Mullins appeared on behalf of Defendant for AFPD Cheryll Bennett; Defendant consented to proceeding by video; Defendant WAIVED his right to a Preliminary Hearing on 2/11/2022 as to Johnathan Dale Stump; the Waiver has been executed; the Waiver will be filed with the Court; Defendant will remain in custody; Defendant is bound over to the Grand Jury. Related [+] (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: 11:02-11:05
15 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 3/29/2022. by USA as to Johnathan Dale Stump. (Saunders, Ryan) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
16 16 WAIVER OF TIMELY INDICTMENT/INFORMATION by Johnathan Dale Stump. (Saunders, Ryan) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Johnathan Dale Stump. (rp) [3:22-mj-00028-PBS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
20 20 INFORMATION as to Johnathan Dale Stump (1) count(s) 1. (pb)
Related: [-]