Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:22-cv-01784
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2022
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Case in other court:Belmont County Common Pleas Court, 22-cv-0029
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Gulfport Appalachia, LLC
3001 Quail Springs Parkway
Oklahoma City, OK 73134
Represented By
John C. Ferrell
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Melanie Morgan Norris
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gulfport Energy Corporation
3001 Quail Springs Parkway
Oklahoma City, OK 73134
Represented By
John C. Ferrell
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
John Kevin West
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Melanie Morgan Norris
Steptoe & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DKP Real Estate, LLC
36335 Flat Rock Road
Barnesville, OH 43713
Represented By
Jeremy Dean Martin
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
Timothy Batiste Pettorini
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Daryl W Ward
565000 Somerton Hwy
Barnesville, OH 43713
Represented By
Jeremy Dean Martin
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
Timothy Batiste Pettorini
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan D Ward
565000 Somerton Hwy
Barnesville, OH 43713
Represented By
Jeremy Dean Martin
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info
Timothy Batiste Pettorini
Roetzel & Andress, Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/05 4:22 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/04 1:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff DKP Real Estate, LLC. (Pettorini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 05/03 4:58 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs DKP Real Estate, LLC, Daryl W Ward, Susan D Ward. (Pettorini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 02/05 4:12 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Ferrell, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 11/06 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Ferrell, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
17 17 misc Status Report Mon 08/07 2:12 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 05/08 4:05 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 02/06 12:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Ferrell, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 11/08 5:15 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (Ferrell, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Mon 08/01 12:54 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
12 12 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 05/02 10:07 AM
OPINION and ORDER granting in part6 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/2/2022. (jk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
11 11 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Fri 04/15 4:08 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The Court will reconvene the parties to establish formal deadlines as appropriate following disposition of Gulfports Motion to Compel/Dismiss. Venue and Jurisdiction Deadline due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 15, 2022. (jlk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/14 1:08 PM
NOTICE : The PPTC set for 4/19/2022 at 11:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. 10].) (sln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 04/12 5:09 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs DKP Real Estate, LLC, Daryl W Ward, Susan D Ward. (Pettorini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/06 4:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Compel Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint or Stay This Action Pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/04 3:07 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (West, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/28 3:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to6 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint or Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs DKP Real Estate, LLC, Daryl W Ward & Susan D Ward. (er)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Compel Mon 03/28 3:08 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint or Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed originally in Belmont County CPC on 3/10/22 by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia, LLC & Gulfport Energy Corporation. (er)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 03/28 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2022 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
4 4 cmp Complaint Fri 03/25 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (ds)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/25 12:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/25 12:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Appalachia, LLC. (West, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/25 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal from Belmont County Common Pleas, case number 22-cv-0029 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8791348), filed by Gulfport Appalachia, LLC, Gulfport Energy Corporation. (West, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Discovery Responses,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Discovery Responses,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet