BARRIONUEVO v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Referred: | Alicia O Valle |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-60619 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Principal Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Principal National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Principal Securities, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Scott J. Silverman
|
|
Plaintiff
Luis O. Barrionuevo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel and Removal from Service List (Bullock, Jennifer) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Attorneys
Fri 11/04 2:28 PM
Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr representing Principal Life Insurance Company (Defendant) and Principal National Life Insurance Company (Defendant) and Principal Securities, Inc. (Defendant); terminated Per DE#33. (cqs) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MEDIATION REPORT by Scott Silverman. Disposition: Adjourned.(Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER GRANTING28 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 9/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (jve) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Tue 09/06 6:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING AS MOOT27 Defendants' Motion to Overrule Plaintiff's Objections and to Compel, based upon the entry of the parties'30 Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 9/6/2022. (jve) |
||
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses and to Overrule Objections filed by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Replies due by 9/8/2022.(Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc..(Garabedian, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
![]() MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses and to Overrule Objections by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Responses due by 9/1/2022(Garabedian, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Sunday, July 10, 2022 | ||
order
Order Scheduling Mediation
Sun 07/10 2:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Scott J. Silverman. Mediation Hearing set for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM via videoconference. All parties and counsel shall attend. The parties shall file a mediation report with the Court no later than three (3) days following conclusion of mediation. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/11/2022. (pls) |
||
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Scott J. Silverman as Mediator.(Garabedian, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2023 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022., Discovery due by 4/20/2023., Expert Discovery due by 4/20/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 8/8/2022., Mediation Deadline 4/27/2023., In Limine Motions due by 6/30/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 5/5/2023., Motions due by 5/5/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/1/2023.)( Mediation Deadline 4/27/2023.) Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.(Bullock, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/8/2022 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. (Garabedian, Charles) |
|
20 | 20
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Principal Life Insurance Company. (Garabedian, Charles) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc., filed by Luis O. Barrionuevo.(Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Development Investors, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Real Estate Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Delaware II, Other Affiliate Principal Life Insurance Company of Iowa, Other Affiliate Principal Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Principal Reissuance Company of Vermont for Principal Life Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc. (Bullock, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jennifer Saltz Bullock (Bullock, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr on behalf of Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Mark Garabedian, Jr added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Garabedian, Charles) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 04/18 2:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document All Defendants. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/18/2022. (pls) |
||
Saturday, April 16, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal National Life Insurance Company, Principal Securities, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal National Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Saltz Bullock added to party Principal Securities, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bullock, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/06 9:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Caroline K. Kwak. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/6/2022. (pls) |
||
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Caroline K. Kwak. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15533158 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Responses due by 4/19/2022 (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/05 12:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael S. Loeffler. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/5/2022. (pls) |
||
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Loeffler. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15527860 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Responses due by 4/18/2022(Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal Securities, Inc. served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis O. Barrionuevo. Principal National Life Insurance Company served on 3/29/2022, response/answer due 4/19/2022. (Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
order
Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Tue 03/29 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/29/2022. (pls) |
||
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 03/29 10:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/29/2022. (pls) |
||
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Michael S. Loeffler and Caroline K. Kwak, mailing date March 28, 2022. (cw) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCIPAL SECURITIES, INC, Principal Life Insurance Company. (cds) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against PRINCIPAL NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PRINCIPAL SECURITIES, INC, Principal Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15508281, filed by LUIS O. BARRIONUEVO.(Osborne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/28 9:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |