CCX, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:22-bk-10252 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 19, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
CCX, Inc.
101 Braeburn Rd
Lower Burrell, PA 15068-2259 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Braeburn Alloy files for bankruptcy, proposes sale to new owner (triblive.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/07/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
372 | 372
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Wed 03/27 4:46 PM
Adversary case 24-50023 Complaint -- Complaint for Turnover of Debtor's Property, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 542 by CCX, Inc. against PMA Companies, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). AP Summons Served due date: 6/25/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |