Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 6:22-cv-01079
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2022
Terminated:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 23, 2022 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Midway Logistics LLC
Represented By
Michelle Moe Witte
Martin Pringle Oliver Wallace & Bauer, Llp - Wichita
contact info
Defendant
Ali Faiz Alwidyan
Represented By
Michelle Moe Witte
Martin Pringle Oliver Wallace & Bauer, Llp - Wichita
contact info
Plaintiff
Sashene Wright
Represented By
Sean M. McGivern
Graybill & Hazlewood LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 09 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/9/2022. (kas)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 30, 2023
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/30 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sashene Wright (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/31 9:52 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/14 10:22 AM
ORDER granting31 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint and Exchange Documents. Defendants Midway Logistics LLC and Ali Faiz Alwidyan a/k/a Danny Alwidyan shall have until December 21, 2022, to file their answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint. All parties must exchange the documents identified in their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by December 21, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/13 4:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re13 Amended Complaint And Exchange Documents by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC Related [+] (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Thursday, December 01, 2022
30 30 adr ADR Report Thu 12/01 11:36 AM
ADR REPORT by Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC. ADR session held on: 11/17/2022 and conducted by Diane Sorensen. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Pre-Discovery(Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/18 10:35 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re13 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC Related [+] (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/18 4:15 PM
ORDER granting28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint and Exchange Documents. Defendants Midway Logistics LLC and Ali Faiz Alwidyan a/k/a Danny Alwidyan shall have until December 14, 2022, to file their answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint. All parties must exchange the documents identified in their Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by December 14, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/18/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
27 27 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 11/09 11:10 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/9/2022. (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
26 26 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/02 4:51 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. The court finds good cause to enter the proposed order submitted by the parties, with slight revisions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/2/2022. (amh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/01 11:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: estimated trial time 4 days. Mediation deadline 11/17/2022. Discovery deadline 4/28/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 6/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/1/2022. (ht)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/01 11:45 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
motion Protective Order Tue 11/01 4:53 PM
Joint Motion Requesting the Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on November 1, 2022. Related [+] (ht)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Thursday, October 20, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Service Thu 10/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Disclosures (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 10/03 4:36 PM
ORDER due to the filing at DE 15, the Court is finding as moot8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/26 4:01 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC re:15 Motion to Dismiss (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Mon 09/26 10:42 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2022 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/11/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/20/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/26/2022. (ht)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 09/12 3:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to15 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC Related [+] (Witte, Michelle) Modified on 9/12/2022 to re-link to correct document. (jk)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 09/12 3:59 PM
ORDER granting17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Reply deadline 9/26/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/12/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
16 16 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/29 9:33 PM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Sashene Wright re15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 08/08 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/25 4:46 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sashene Wright re8 Motion to Dismiss (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/25 4:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sashene Wright.(McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/21 1:30 PM
ORDER granting11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time as to8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss And Memorandum In Support MOTION for extension of time to amend complaint as a matter of course . Response deadline 7/25/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/20 7:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time as to8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss And Memorandum In Support , MOTION for extension of time to amend complaint as a matter of course ( Response deadline 8/3/2022) by Plaintiff Sashene Wright Related [+] (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/06 1:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss And Memorandum In Support and to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Sashene Wright Related [+] (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/06 1:59 PM
ORDER granting9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to8 Amended MOTION to Dismiss And Memorandum In Support and to File Amended Complaint . Response deadline 7/20/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/6/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 06/15 2:08 PM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss And Memorandum In Support by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 06/15 1:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
6 6 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Wed 06/01 11:26 AM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/16/2022 for Defendants Midway Logistics LLC, Ali Faiz Alwidyan to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/01/2022. (jk)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 06/01 10:36 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Moe Witte on behalf of All Defendants. (Witte, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
4 4 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Thu 05/19 9:08 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Sashene Wright upon Midway Logistics LLC served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022 (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
3 3 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Wed 05/18 9:56 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Sashene Wright upon Ali Faiz Alwidyan served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022 (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
service Summons Issued Fri 04/22 3:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ali Faiz Alwidyan, Midway Logistics LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 03/28 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 27, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 03/27 10:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sashene Wright. (McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Sun 03/27 10:43 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5744336.), filed by Sashene Wright.(McGivern, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - Consent to Join - Sashene Wright