California Central District Court
Judge:Ronald Sw Lew
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:22-cv-02024
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2022
Terminated:Sep 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Justin Drew Bieber
Represented By
Bobby A. Ghajar
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael G Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Josiah Kamau
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
17 17 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Wed 09/07 11:51 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
16 16 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 09/06 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
14 14 notice Settlement Thu 09/01 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 09/01 3:23 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, re: Notice of Settlement14 received in the above-referenced action. This is to bring to your attention that the Notice of Settlement does not vacate or continue dates and deadlines. The parties need to make a request, attaching a proposed order, separate from the Notice of Settlement. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 07/20 2:07 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Justin Drew Bieber answer now due 9/1/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Justin Drew Bieber.(Attorney Bobby A. Ghajar added to party Justin Drew Bieber(pty:dft))(Ghajar, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/18 12:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau, upon Defendant Justin Drew Bieber served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MYMAN GREENSPAN FOX ROSENBERG MOBASSER YOUNGER & LIGHT, CURRENT ATTORNEY in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
11 11 order Enlargement of Time to File Service by Publication Tue 07/05 11:28 AM
ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Permission to Serve Defendant by Way of Substitute Service10 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall effectuate service by (1) sending copies of the service documents to Defendant's current talent representatives, and/or (2) sending copies to Defendant's current law firm, and/or (3) sending copies via electronic direct message to Defendant's verified Instagram account, and/or (4) Plaintiff shall publish the summons. Plaintiff's time to effectuate service is extended for a period of 60 days from the date of this Order. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
10 10 motion Enlargement of Time to File Document Service by Publication Mon 06/27 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (unopposed) , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Service by Publication (unopposed) filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's IMDB page,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Non-Service,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, March 28, 2022
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/28 3:09 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to defendant Justin Drew Bieber. (rolm)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/28 3:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/28 3:08 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/28 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (rolm)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/28 9:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau, identifying Sanders Law Group, Craig B. Sanders, Justin Drew Bieber. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Mon 03/28 9:04 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Josiah Kamau. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 03/28 9:04 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/28 9:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/28 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33016073 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Josiah Kamau. (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Josiah Kamau(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph