Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:22-cv-00806
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2022
Terminated:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Esnard
Clerk's Entry of Default 9/15/2022 507 Sunlight Dr.
Arlington, TX 76006
Defendant
Gabriel Lee
Clerk's Entry of Default 9/15/2022 11415 Aquilla Dr.
Frisco, TX 75036
Defendant
Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC
Clerk's Entry of Default 9/15/2022 Through Registered Agent, Butler & Gatz, CPA 746 Colonial Dr., Ste. 1A
Garland, TX 75043
Plaintiff
Vernell Hall
Represented By
Graham Halsey Williams
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info
M. Suzanne Montero
Sternberg Naccari & White
contact info
Scott L. Sternberg
Sternberg, Naccari & White LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Donielle Lee
Terminated: 08/18/2022
Represented By
Nicholas H. Berg
Reasonover & Berg LLC
contact info
Alex S Aughtry
Reasonover & Berg, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam Wed 09/20 10:21 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/1/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. The Judgment Debtors, Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, L.L.C., Gabriel Lee, and Joseph Esnard shall appear in person on that date at that time to satisfy the judgment debtor examination. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at least two (2) weeks prior to the Judgment Debtor Examination the Judgment Debtors, Lees Capital Consulting Firm, L.L.C., Gabriel Lee, and Joseph Esnard, shall produce the records, books, papers, and other documents described in the attached Exhibit A to Sternberg, Naccari, & White, L.L.C., 950 Gravier Street, Suite 2020 New Orleans, LA 70112. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/19/23. (cg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 09/19 10:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on September 18, 2023.(mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
30 30 motion Judgment Debtor Exam Fri 09/15 3:35 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam by Vernell Hall. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas.(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Notice of Submission
Friday, September 23, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 09/23 2:18 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED that the Motion25 be GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there be a Final Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff, Vernell Hall, and against Defendants, Lee's Capital Consulting, LLC, Gabriel Lee, and Joseph Esnard in the amount of $160,366.32. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 09/23/2022. (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
25 25 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/19 4:41 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC, Gabriel Lee, & Joseph Esnard by Vernell Hall. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/19/2022.(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Thursday, September 15, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 09/15 4:26 PM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC, Gabriel Lee, and Joseph Esnard. Issued by Clerk on 9/15/2022. (cwa)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 09/15 4:08 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw20 Motion for Default Judgment. The Motion for Default Judgment is removed from the record of this matter. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 09/15/2022. (ko)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw Document Thu 09/15 11:30 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document 20 Motion for Entry of Default by Vernell Hall. (Williams, Graham) Modified text/link on 9/15/2022 (ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
21 21 motion Entry of Default Tue 09/13 2:32 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC, Gabriel Lee, & Joseph Esnard by Vernell Hall. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/13/2022.(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Friday, September 02, 2022
20 20 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/02 9:53 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC, Gabriel Lee, & Joseph Esnard by Vernell Hall. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/2/2022.(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Thursday, August 18, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Thu 08/18 1:33 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Donielle Lee, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 08/18/2022. (ko)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
18 18 2 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 08/16 11:10 AM
Memorandum by Vernell Hall re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
17 17 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Tue 08/02 11:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Donielle Lee. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/24/2022.(Berg, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Donielle Lee,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Friday, July 29, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 07/29 10:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion and Incorporated Memorandum in Response to Show Cause Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to file responsive pleadings is hereby extended to August 15, 2022. FURTHER ORDERED that should Defendants fail to file responsive pleadings by August 15, 2022, Plaintiff's Complaint shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute unless she moves for default or shows cause in writing by September 5, 2022 why they should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/29/2022. (jls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/28 4:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re12 Order to Show Cause,, by Vernell Hall. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/28/2022. (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/11 5:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant Donielle Lee shall have an extension of time until August 1, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/11/2022. (jls)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/11 1:56 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Donielle Lee.Attorney Nicholas H. Berg added to party Donielle Lee(pty:dft).(Berg, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 08, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/08 3:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff: ORDERED that the plaintiff move for entry of default against defendants, Gabriel Lee, Donielle Lee, Joseph Esnard, and Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC, under Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or show good cause in writing within twenty (20) days why these defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If counsel for plaintiff fails to move for entry of default or show good cause in writing, the aforementioned defendants will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute without further notice in accordance with Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 07/08/2022.(ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Thu 07/07 4:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Meriem Seddiki of Complaint and Summons served on Lee Capital Consulting Firm, LLC on 4/21/22.(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 05/03 9:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Joseph Esnard, Donielle Lee, Gabriel Lee.(sbs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Monday, May 02, 2022
9 9 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Mon 05/02 2:15 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Mon 05/02 2:14 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Mon 05/02 2:14 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/13 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Donielle Lee, Gabriel Lee.(sbs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
5 5 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Wed 04/13 9:53 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Submitted for Issuance Wed 04/13 9:53 AM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/29 12:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Joseph Esnard, Donielle Lee, Gabriel Lee, Lee's Capital Consulting Firm, LLC.(cwa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 03/29 8:13 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/28 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9293889) filed by Vernell Hall.Attorney Graham Halsey Williams added to party Vernell Hall(pty:pla).(Williams, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons,
Att: 3 Summons Summons,
Att: 4 Summons Summons,
Att: 5 Summons Summons