Breaking Code Silence v. Katherine McNamara et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maria A Audero |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-02052 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jan 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 2:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
Katherine McNamara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeremy Whiteley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Michael G Balmages
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Breaking Code Silence
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
200 | 200
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 04/10 1:45 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2)198 by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
199 | 199
order
For Order re Discovery Matter
Tue 04/09 7:22 AM
FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION Granting193 RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Telephone Conference re:196 Order (es) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
198 | 198
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/08 6:47 PM
REQUEST to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiff Breaking Code Silence. (Gibson, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
197 | 197
transcript
Audio Recording Form (AO-436)
Mon 04/08 9:14 AM
COMPACT DISC Order for date of proceedings 3/25/2024 & 4/5/2024. Court will contact Jeremy Whiteley at jeremy@medtexter.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: FEE NOT PAID. (aa) |
|
196 | 196
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 04/05 3:27 PM
MINUTES OF (In Person and Telephonic): Status Conference and Informal Discovery Conference re: Outcome of Phase 1 (ECF Nos. 181, 193) held before Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: The Court confers with the parties regarding the outcome of the Phase 1. In light of developments made through the Phase 1 process toward obtaining the discovery at issue and for the reasons stated on the record, the Court determines that the Sanctions Motion needs to be supplemented. The Court SETS the following briefing schedule for supplementation of the Sanctions Motion: Defendants' supplemental brief is due no later than April 22, 2024. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' supplemental brief is due no later than May 6, 2024. Defendants' optional reply on their supplemental brief is due no later than May 13, 2024. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: XTR 3/25/24; XtR 4/5/2024 (es) |