LITTON v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-04726 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:22-cv-00604 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2022 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BOBBY LITTON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by Bobby Litton. (WENDT, SAMUEL) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 4/18/2022 .) (djb) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement. (djb) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-00604. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
6 | 6 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re:1 Notice of Removal,. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/29/2022.] | |
5 | 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Samuel M. Wendt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/29/2022.] | |
4 | 4 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-604 (JRT/TNL). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/29/2022.] | |
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |