Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:22-cv-00298
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2022
Terminated:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 25, 2022 3:59 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
iCHOOSR, LLC
Represented By
Matthew J. Mussalli
Law Office Of Matthew J. Mussalli
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Top Worldwide, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Urban
Law Offices Of Steven D. Urban
contact info
Defendant
Top Worldwide, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Urban
Law Offices Of Steven D. Urban
contact info
Plaintiff
iCHOOSR, LLC
Represented By
Matthew J. Mussalli
Law Office Of Matthew J. Mussalli
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 31, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/31 1:17 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 05/30 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims by Top Worldwide, LLC.(Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/19 8:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Mediation Completed on or before 4/1/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2023, Discovery due by 3/15/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/13 3:53 PM
ORDER CANCELLING ZOOM SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 10/13 2:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Scheduling Advisory by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/11 1:40 PM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that the case is set for a 30-minute hearing on October 16, 2023 at 3:00 pm. The hearing will be conducted by ZOOM before Judge Dustin M. Howell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meaningfully confer either in-person or via phone about the scheduling issues in dispute, and they shall then jointly file an advisory by 2pm on October 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/07 3:40 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL, This cause is referred to the Honorable Howell, United States Magistrate Judge, to meet with all parties in this case to discuss scheduling deadlines (dkt no. 17 &18). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
18 18 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 09/01 8:27 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 09/01 5:13 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Top Worldwide, LLC. (Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
16 16 7 pgs order Order Fri 08/18 12:14 PM
ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/27 4:22 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
14 14 trial Witness List Tue 02/28 9:35 PM
Witness List by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 trial Exhibit List Tue 02/28 9:33 PM
Exhibit List by iCHOOSR, LLC.. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 trial Exhibit List Tue 02/28 6:28 PM
Exhibit List by Top Worldwide, LLC.. (Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 trial Witness List Tue 02/28 6:27 PM
Witness List by Top Worldwide, LLC. (Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/08 8:50 AM
ORDER Setting Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference for 8/11/2023 3:00 PM in Austin before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
9 9 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 02/01 4:13 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 02/01 3:01 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 07/08 11:17 AM
PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS to4 Answer to Complaint by iCHOOSR, LLC.(Mussalli, Matthew) Modified docket text on 7/8/2022 (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 07/01 4:50 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 07/01 4:00 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Top Worldwide, LLC. (Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 06/09 6:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Steven Douglas Urban added to party Top Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against iCHOOSR, LLC by Top Worldwide, LLC.(Urban, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/31 7:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Top Worldwide, LLC. (dl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/29 5:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by iCHOOSR, LLC. (Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/29 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15867249), filed by iCHOOSR, LLC.(Mussalli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/31 7:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Thu 03/31 7:44 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (dl)
Related: [-]