New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Paul J Evangelista
Case #: 1:22-cv-00296
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2022
Re-opened:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 24, 2022 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Glens Falls Hospital
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Kevin M. Grassi
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Nicole Bennett
Represented By
Christopher Joseph Daniel
Martin Clearwater & Bell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lynette M. Biss
Defendant
Stephanie Dechene
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Alycia N. Gregory
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Amy Hooper
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Nix
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Stacey L. Ralph
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Karen Ranttila
Represented By
Cathleen Kelly Rebar
Rebar Kelly
contact info
Defendant
Jodie Smith
Represented By
Eric C. Schwenker
Mcphillips, Fitzgerald Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Costin
Represented By
William H. Gussman
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Taleah E. Jennings
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
John Paul Mixon
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
Frances Rodriguez
Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-7
Terminated: 06/23/2022

GPO Feb 15 2023
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 61 Motion to Substitute Party: The Court hereby ORDERS that the GFH Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 26), Midwife Bennett's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 47), and Nurse Ranttila's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 50) are GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the United States' motion to substitute and dismiss the complaint (Dkt. No. 61) is DENIED as moot; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/15/2023. (ban)
GPO Dec 04 2024
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 72 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 73 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/4/2024. (ban)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
122 122 motion Joinder Wed 04/30 8:10 PM
MOTION for Joinder and for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Stephanie Dechene, Glens Falls Hospital, Kevin M. Grassi, Alycia N. Gregory, Amy Hooper, Jennifer Nix, Stacey L. Ralph, Jodie Smith. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2025 Motions referred to Paul J. Evangelista. (Yetto, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Declaration Jennifer M. Yetto, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Proposed Third Party Complaint against HHHN,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Proposed Amended Answer