Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:22-cr-60060
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 30, 2022 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Igor Kazhdan (1)
Represented By
Mark Steven Solomon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Andy Camacho
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/15/2022 11:16 AM EDT
Thursday, February 10, 2022
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT as to Igor Kazhdan (1). (dd) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (dd) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Igor Kazhdan (dd) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Igor Kazhdan Initial Appearance set for 2/11/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Initial Appearance as to Igor Kazhdan held on 2/11/2022. Bond set: Igor Kazhdan (1) $500,000 PSB. Arraignment set for 3/4/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 2/18/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
5 5 6 pgs $500,000.00 PSB Bond Entered as to Igor Kazhdan Approved by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (tw) (tw). [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/14/2022) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Friday, February 18, 2022
6 6 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Steven Solomon appearing for Igor Kazhdan. Attorney Mark Steven Solomon added to party Igor Kazhdan(pty:dft). (at) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow: Report Re Counsel Hearing as to Igor Kazhdan held on 2/18/2022.. Attorney added: Mark Steven Solomon for Igor Kazhdan (Digital 11:15:50) (at) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
8 8 MOTION for Bond by Igor Kazhdan. Responses due by 3/11/2022(Solomon, Mark) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
9 9 1 pgs ORDER granting8 unopposed motion to amend bond conditions as to Igor Kazhdan (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (PMH) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
10 10 2 pgs AGREED MOTION TO RESET THE DEFENDANT'S ARRAIGNMENT FOR AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY DAYS by Igor Kazhdan. (at) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER granting10 Motion to Continue as to Igor Kazhdan (1). The time period between March 4 and April 4, 2022 is hereby excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18:U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting the continuance outweighs the interests of the Defendant and the public in a speedy trial. Arraignment RESET for 4/4/2022 AT 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 3/3/2022). (See attached document for full details). (at) [0:22-mj-06066-PMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
12 12 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to Igor Kazhdan (1) count(s) 1-5, 6-10, 11-13. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/30/2022) Restricted Unredacted Indictment