1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Bryant Godinez in violation of 18:2114(a) Robbery of Mail and Property of the United States. Approved by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Bryant Godinez (1). (cio)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Bryant Godinez; defendants Year of Birth: 1996; date of arrest: 2/26/2022 (cio)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Bryant Godinez (cio)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Defendant Bryant Godinez. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: David Robert Reed for Bryant Godinez, Appointed, present. Court orders defendant permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/14/2022 04:30 PM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 3/22/2022 10:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: CS 02/28/2022. (cio)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Bryant Godinez. (cio)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
CONSENT to Video Conference/Telephonic Conference filed by Defendant Bryant Godinez. (cio)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Bryant Godinez. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (cio)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Bryant Godinez is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on 03/14/2022 at 3:00 PM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (cio)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym as to Defendant Bryant Godinez, (cio)
Related: [-]
|