Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:22-cv-20958
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2022
Terminated:May 26, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC
Represented By
Melodie Rivero
Boyd Richards
contact info
Kyle Thomas Berglin
Boyd Richards Parker & Colonnelli, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Martinez Distributors Corp.
Represented By
Melodie Rivero
Boyd Richards
contact info
Kyle Thomas Berglin
Boyd Richards Parker & Colonnelli, P.L.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By
Juan Courtney Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 06/15 6:03 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Plaintiff's13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 06/14 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Thu 05/26 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Martinez Distributors Corp. (Rivero, Melodie)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 05/26 3:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of11 Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/28 8:55 AM
Reset Deadlines Per DE#10. Responses due by 5/26/2022 (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/27 1:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response on or before May 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/26 2:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re1 Complaint, by MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, Martinez Distributors Corp.. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (Berglin, Kyle)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/26 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melodie Rivero on behalf of MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, Martinez Distributors Corp.. Attorney Melodie Rivero added to party MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Melodie Rivero added to party Martinez Distributors Corp.(pty:dft). (Rivero, Melodie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/26 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Thomas Berglin on behalf of MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, Martinez Distributors Corp.. Attorney Kyle Thomas Berglin added to party MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle Thomas Berglin added to party Martinez Distributors Corp.(pty:dft). (Berglin, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 04/08 4:22 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022; Martinez Distributors Corp. served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, March 31, 2022
order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 03/31 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
Related: [-]
order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 03/31 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/30 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, Martinez Distributors Corp. (jua)
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/30 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT against MARTINEZ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC, Martinez Distributors Corp.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15516376, filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 03/30 10:06 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
Related: [-]