Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 3:22-cv-00254
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Dennis Chapman
Represented By
Calvert S Miller
Carson Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Eric M Blume
Carson Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Larry L Barnard
Carson Llp - Fw/in
contact info
Laura L Scarry
Deano & Scarry LLC
contact info
Defendant
Vicki E Becker
Represented By
Adrienne Pope
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Defendant
Todd Thayer
Represented By
Matthew S Clark
Knight Hoppe Kurnik & Knight Ltd - Ros/il
contact info
Katlyn M Christman
Knight Hoppe Kurnik & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Joseph W Smith
Knight Hoppe Kurnik & Knight Ltd - Mer/in
contact info
Defendant
State of Indiana
Represented By
Adrienne Pope
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Defendant
Peggy Snider
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Michael Sigsbee
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Elkhart County Prosecutor's Office
Represented By
Adrienne Pope
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Defendant
Elkhart County
Represented By
Nathaniel M Jordan
Yoder Ainlay Ulmer & Buckingham LLP
contact info
Jacob T Palcic
Yoder Ainlay Ulmer & Buckingham LLP
contact info
Michael F DeBoni
Yoder Ainlay Ulmer & Buckingham LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elkhart City of
Law Department 229 S. Second Street
Elkhart, IN 46516
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Mark Daggy
Represented By
Liberty L Roberts
Church Church Hittle & Antrim Llp - Nob/in
contact info
Cassie Nichole Heeke
Church Church Hittle & Antrim Llp - Nob/in
contact info
Defendant
Brett Coppins
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Carlton Conway
Represented By
James G Sotos
The Sotos Law Firm PC
contact info
Jeffrey R Kivetz
The Sotos Law Firm PC
contact info
Elizabeth R Fleming
The Sotos Law Firm PC
contact info
Laura M Ranum
The Sotos Law Firm PC
contact info
Defendant
Paul Converse
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Defendant
Joel Bourdon
Represented By
Alexander P Will
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Anthony W Overholt
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Elise Bowling
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Royer
Represented By
Jon Loevy
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Margaret E Campbell
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Elliot R Slosar
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
251 251 notice Bright Line Notice Tue 05/06 10:44 AM
NOTICE: Because the discovery period in this case has now concluded and there are no pending non-dispositive motions, the referral to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins is now terminated. All further matters will now be handled by Judge Cristal C Brisco unless otherwise directed. This entry constitutes the court's order on this matter and shall carry the same weight and authority as a written order signed by the judge. (mr)
Related: [-]
250 250 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/06 10:44 AM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by attys Elliot Slosar and Kathryn Montenegro. Atty Alexander Carlisle appeared on behalf of Dft, Vicki Becker. Parties advise discovery has been concluded. Court will bright line case. Court addresses247 Defendant's Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motions Deadline. Arguments heard. For reasons stated on the record, Court grants motion and extends dispositive motions deadline to 5/31/2025. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
249 249 respm Response to Motion Tue 05/06 10:28 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re247 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by Andrew Royer. (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
248 248 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/02 2:31 PM
Defendant Vicki Becker's ANSWER to244 Amended Complaint by Vicki E Becker.(Carlisle, Alexander)
Related: [-]