Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-10069
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 31, 2022 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Christina Iannelli (1)
Represented By
Jessica P. Thrall
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
James R. Drabick
Us Attorney'S Office - Ma
contact info

GPO Oct 31 2023
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. For the foregoing reasons, the motion of defendant, Christina Iannelli, to dismiss Count VIII of the indictment (Docket No. 64) is DENIED. (McManus, Caetlin)

Docket last updated: 03/31/2022 3:49 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Christina Iannelli (1) count(s) 1-7, 8.(DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS45
2 2 MOTION to Seal as to Christina Iannelli by USA. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING2 Motion to Seal as to Christina Iannelli (1) (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Christina Iannelli. (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Christina Iannelli; Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
6 6 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal Reason for referral: Full Pretrial Proceedings as to Christina Iannelli (DaSilva, Carolina)
Related: [-]