Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04812
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Last checked: Friday Sep 30, 2022 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOESE ALAVAREZ
215 Orleans
Beaumont, TX 40983
Represented By
BRENT WAYNE COON
Brent Coon & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 9:11 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: A REMINDER - Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). Clerk will reassign judges and correct origin code. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/31 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6888402.), filed by JOESE ALAVAREZ. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Docket Annotation Thu 03/31 4:25 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: A REMINDER - Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File (not 1 Original Proceeding). Clerk will reassign judges and correct origin code. (djb)
Related: [-]