EQUALITY FLORIDA et al v. FLORIDA STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Allen C Winsor |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00134 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Atlanta GA, 22-12392-GG USCA Atlanta GA, 23-10866-B USCA Atlanta GA, 23-10866-B |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 5:56 AM EDT |
Amicus
STATE OF MARYLAND
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF COLORADO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF CONNECTICUT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA NEW JERSEY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CHRISTIAN ACTION NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF DELAWARE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF HAWAII
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MAINE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MICHIGAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF MINNESOTA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEVADA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF OREGON
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STATE OF NEW YORK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BEN GIBSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MONESIA BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PASCO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ORANGE COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JACOB OLIVA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESTHER BYRD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BROWARD SCHOOL BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GRAZIE P CHRISTIE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOE YORK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RICHARD CORCORAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ST JOHNS COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCHOOL BOARD OF SARASOTA COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCHOOL BOARD OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCHOOL BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RYAN PETTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS R GRADY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FLORIDA STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENT VANTICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANH VOLMER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MYNDEE WASHINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S S
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SCOTT BERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAN VANTICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDSEY BINGHAM SHOOK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANITA HATCHER POWDERLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RABBI AMY MORRISON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZANDER MORICZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LINDSAY MCCLELLAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DR CECILE HOURY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KIMBERLY FEINBERG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FAMILY EQUALITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EQUALITY FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOURDES CASARES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M A
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
RONALD D DESANTIS
Terminated: 07/28/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JACKSON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Terminated: 05/25/2022
|
Represented By
|