New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:22-cv-01823
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1441 - Notice of Removal: Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Nov 29, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
MATTHEW ADAM SKLAR
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Defendant
BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC.
Represented By
OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
MATTHEW ADAM SKLAR
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK LONG FUND, LTD.
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK LONG ENHANCED FUND, LTD.
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK FUND, USA LTD.
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK FUND II, LTD.
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD., as asignee of Maverick Fund, L.D.C and Maverick Select Fund, Ltd.
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LFJR 2012 DYNASTY LLC - SERIES A
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LFJR 2010 GRAT REMAINDER TRUST
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO MARION FLINN MOULTON
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO LAWRENCE FLINN III
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO ADRIANE S. FLINN
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT mbH
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD.
Represented By
THOMAS M CAROCCIA
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
PATRICK ROCCO
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
PATRICK LOUIS ROCCO
Fleischman Bonner & Rocco LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PACIFIC FUNDS SERIES TRUST
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
PACIFIC SELECT FUND
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
SEASONS SERIES TRUST
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE AND LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. CHARITABLE TRUST
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE S. FLINN MASTER PARTNERSHIP
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STICHTING BEDRIJFSTAKPENSIOENFONDS VOOR HET SCHILDERS-AFWERKINGSEN GLASZETBEDRIJF
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
STICHTING PGGM DEPOSITARY
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USAA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
VALIC COMPANY I
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
VALIC COMPANY II
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD
Represented By
KAREN M. LERNER
Kirby Mcinerney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO TRUST
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EAST 71, LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FLINN INVESTMENTS, LLC
Plaintiff
GIC PRIVATE LTD.
Represented By
JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
2012 DYNASTY UC LLC
Represented By
STEPHEN WILLIAM TOUNTAS
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE)
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P.
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO FUNDS PLC
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND
Represented By
LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 29 2022
MEMORANDUM & OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/29/2022. (jal, )

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
21 21 order Order Reassigning Case Mon 11/27 11:52 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/27/2023. (km)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/27 1:05 PM
Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. (km, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 07/11 3:44 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case20 filed by Thomas Caroccia on 7/7/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk's Office has terminated the calendar entry created by this event and will remove Thomas M. Caroccia from noticing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/07 12:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas Caroccia by OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD.. (CAROCCIA, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
19 19 1 pgs misc Letter: Remand Tue 11/29 2:56 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Somerset County Courthouse 20 North Bridge Street Somerville, NJ 08876-1262 State No: SOM C 012010 22. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (jal, )
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 11/29 2:53 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Remand to the New Jersey Superior Court. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/29/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
17 17 19 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 11/29 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM & OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/29/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/29 2:58 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
misc QC - Invalid Email Mon 11/21 3:12 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - JEFFREY A. ALMEIDA does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (jml, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Fri 11/18 8:55 PM
Letter from Matthew A. Sklar to The Hon. Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re15 Letter. (SKLAR, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
15 15 5 pgs misc Letter Wed 11/16 6:18 PM
Letter from All Plaintiffs to Hon. Michael A. Shipp. (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
14 14 4 pgs misc Letter Mon 08/29 5:09 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Michael A. Shipp re13 Letter. (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
13 13 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 08/25 5:06 PM
Letter from Matthew A. Sklar to The Honorable Michael A. Shipp, U.S.D.J. re12 Letter. (SKLAR, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
12 12 5 pgs misc Letter Tue 08/23 6:08 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Michael A. Shipp re: subsequent material development. (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
11 11 18 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/03 5:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by 2012 DYNASTY UC LLC, BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C., BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD, BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD., EAST 71, LTD., FLINN INVESTMENTS, LLC, GIC PRIVATE LTD., GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND, GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND, GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND, GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO, GMO FUNDS PLC, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST, GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND, GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND, GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P., GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE), GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P., GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD., GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO, GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND, GMO TRUST, GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC, INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP, INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP, INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT mbH, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO ADRIANE S. FLINN, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO LAWRENCE FLINN III, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO MARION FLINN MOULTON, LFJR 2010 GRAT REMAINDER TRUST, LFJR 2012 DYNASTY LLC - SERIES A, MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD, MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD., as asignee of Maverick Fund, L.D.C and Maverick Select Fund, Ltd., MAVERICK FUND II, LTD., MAVERICK FUND, USA LTD., MAVERICK LONG ENHANCED FUND, LTD., MAVERICK LONG FUND, LTD., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P., OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD., PACIFIC FUNDS SERIES TRUST, PACIFIC SELECT FUND, SEASONS SERIES TRUST, STEPHANIE AND LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. CHARITABLE TRUST, STEPHANIE S. FLINN MASTER PARTNERSHIP, STICHTING BEDRIJFSTAKPENSIOENFONDS VOOR HET SCHILDERS-AFWERKINGSEN GLASZETBEDRIJF, STICHTING PGGM DEPOSITARY, SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, USAA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST, VALIC COMPANY I, VALIC COMPANY II re9 MOTION to Remand (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Reply Declaration of Lawrence M. Rolnick,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Friday, May 20, 2022
10 10 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Fri 05/20 5:41 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION, BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. re9 MOTION to Remand (SKLAR, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew Sklar,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 02, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/02 9:59 AM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
9 9 4 pgs motion Remand to State Court Fri 04/29 6:29 PM
MOTION to Remand by 2012 DYNASTY UC LLC, BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C., BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD, BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD., EAST 71, LTD., FLINN INVESTMENTS, LLC, GIC PRIVATE LTD., GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND, GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND, GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND, GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO, GMO FUNDS PLC, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST, GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND, GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND, GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P., GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE), GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P., GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD., GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO, GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND, GMO TRUST, GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC, INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP, INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP, INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT mbH, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO ADRIANE S. FLINN, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO LAWRENCE FLINN III, LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. 1975 TRUST FBO MARION FLINN MOULTON, LFJR 2010 GRAT REMAINDER TRUST, LFJR 2012 DYNASTY LLC - SERIES A, MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD, MAVERICK CAPITAL LTD., as asignee of Maverick Fund, L.D.C and Maverick Select Fund, Ltd., MAVERICK FUND II, LTD., MAVERICK FUND, USA LTD., MAVERICK LONG ENHANCED FUND, LTD., MAVERICK LONG FUND, LTD., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P., OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD., PACIFIC FUNDS SERIES TRUST, PACIFIC SELECT FUND, SEASONS SERIES TRUST, STEPHANIE AND LAWRENCE FLINN, JR. CHARITABLE TRUST, STEPHANIE S. FLINN MASTER PARTNERSHIP, STICHTING BEDRIJFSTAKPENSIOENFONDS VOOR HET SCHILDERS-AFWERKINGSEN GLASZETBEDRIJF, STICHTING PGGM DEPOSITARY, SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, USAA MUTUAL FUNDS TRUST, VALIC COMPANY I, VALIC COMPANY II.(ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Lawrence M. Rolnick,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 18, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/18 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES HAMPSON on behalf of BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C., BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD, BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD., EAST 71, LTD., GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND, GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND, GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND, GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO, GMO FUNDS PLC, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST, GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND, GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND, GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P., GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE), GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P., GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD., GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO, GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND, GMO TRUST, GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC, INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP, INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP, MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P., SEASONS SERIES TRUST, SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, VALIC COMPANY I, VALIC COMPANY II (HAMPSON, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/14 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M CAROCCIA on behalf of OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD. (CAROCCIA, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/14 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK LOUIS ROCCO on behalf of OKUMUS OPPORTUNISTIC VALUE COMPANY LTD. (ROCCO, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 04/13 6:19 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C., BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD, BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD., EAST 71, LTD., GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND, GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND, GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND, GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO, GMO FUNDS PLC, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST, GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND, GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND, GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P., GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE), GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P., GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD., GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO, GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND, GMO TRUST, GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC, INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP, INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP, MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P., SEASONS SERIES TRUST, SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, VALIC COMPANY I, VALIC COMPANY II. (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/13 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE M. ROLNICK on behalf of BH INVESTMENTS FUND, L.L.C., BRAHMAM PARTNERS IV, LTD, BRAHMAN C.P.F. PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN INSTITUTIONAL PARTNERS, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II OFFSHORE, LTD., BRAHMAN PARTNERS II, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS III, L.P., BRAHMAN PARTNERS IV (CAYMAN), LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL FOCUS MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL MACRO MASTER FUND, LTD., DISCOVERY GLOBAL OPPORTUNITY MASTER FUND, LTD., EAST 71, LTD., GMO ALPHA ONLY FUND, GMO BENCHMARK FREE FUND, GMO DEVELOPED WORLD STOCK FUND, GMO EVENT-DRIVEN MASTER PORTFOLIO, GMO FUNDS PLC, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND, GMO GLOBAL EQUITY TRUST, GMO GLOBAL REAL RETURN (UCITS) FUND, GMO IMPLEMENTATION FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL EQUITY FUND, GMO INTERNATIONAL LARGE/MID CAP EQUITY FUND, GMO MASTER PORTFOLIOS (ONSHORE), L.P., GMO MEAN REVERSION FUND (ONSHORE), GMO MEAN REVERSION SPECIAL SOLUTION FUND, L.P., GMO OFFSHORE MASTER PORTFOLIOS II LTD., GMO TAX-MANAGED GLOBAL BALANCED PORTFOLIO, GMO TAX-MANAGED INTERNATIONAL EQUITIES FUND, GMO TRUST, GMO WORLD EQUITY ALLOCATION INVESTMENT FUND PLC, INCLINE GLOBAL ELS LP, INCLINE GLOBAL MASTER LP, MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS (MM), L.P., MSD TORCHLIGHT PARTNERS, L.P., SEASONS SERIES TRUST, SUNAMERICA SERIES TRUST, VALIC COMPANY I, VALIC COMPANY II, DISCOVERY GLOBAL CITIZENS MASTER FUND, LTD. (ROLNICK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/01 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR ABDUSSELLAM BAREENTTO on behalf of BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION, BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. (BAREENTTO, OMAR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 03/31 5:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION, BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. identifying Bausch Health Companies Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SKLAR, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 03/31 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Somerset County, case number Docket No. C-12010-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13301334), filed by BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC., BAUSCH + LOMB CORPORATION.(SKLAR, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 59 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Statement Rule 11.2 Statement,
Att: 4 Statement Local Rule 201.1 Statement,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/01 4:18 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdg, )
Related: [-]