Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:22-cv-00498
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 6:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko
Represented By
Andrew T. Weiner
Multnomah County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Juan M. Roldan
Represented By
Andrew T. Weiner
Multnomah County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Levi S. Yandell
Represented By
Andrew T. Weiner
Multnomah County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonid P. Krivolenkov
11411 NE 47th Court
Vancouver, WA 98686

GPO Sep 21 2023
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 37). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/21/2023 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 9/22/2023.) (gw)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 26, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 10/31 3:42 PM
USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal48 . Case Appealed to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 23-3094 assigned. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
48 48 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 10/20 12:17 PM
Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Judgment,47 , Opinion and Order,46 Filing fee in amount of $505 collected; Receipt No. 104478 issued. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
47 47 order Judgment - Terminate Case Thu 09/21 5:12 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on the Court's OPINION AND ORDER, IT IS ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed on 9/21/2023 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 9/22/2023.) (gw)
Related: [-]
46 46 17 pgs order Opinion and Order Thu 09/21 5:08 PM
OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No.37 ). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 9/21/2023 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 9/22/2023.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
44 44 resp Reply to Motion Thu 06/01 1:34 PM
Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment 37 . Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order 9 - Taking Motion Under Advisement Thu 06/01 4:47 PM
ORDER: Taking Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.37 ) under advisement as of 6/1/2023. The Court has determined that the motion is suitable for resolution without oral argument. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 6/2/2023.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
43 43 trial 9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document Exhibit Thu 05/18 1:17 PM
This filing includes a conventionally filed Disk. This conventional filing is maintained in the Clerk's Office but cannot be made a part of the court's electronic record in CM/ECF., Exhibits re Declaration42 . Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (sb)
Related: [-]
42 42 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/18 1:15 PM
Declaration of Leonid P. Krivolenkov. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. Related [+] (sb)
Related: [-] Response in Opposition to Motion,41 .
41 41 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/18 12:46 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 37 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (sb) Modified on 5/18/2023 to add language -'Oral Argument requested.' NEF regenerated (sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Thursday, April 27, 2023
40 40 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/27 3:35 PM
Declaration of Levi Yandell . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment37 .
39 39 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/27 3:34 PM
Declaration of David Smith . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment37 .
38 38 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/27 3:33 PM
Declaration of Andrew Weiner . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Motion for Summary Judgment37 .
37 37 motion Summary Judgment Thu 04/27 3:31 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
36 36 adr Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report Fri 03/31 10:05 AM
Joint ADR Report . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell.(Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
minute Rule 16 Conference Mon 12/05 4:29 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 12/5/2022. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Parties are to amend pleadings or add any additional parties or claims by 2/28/2023. Discovery is to be completed by 3/31/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/31/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/28/2023. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. If a discovery dispute arises, the party requesting relief should e-mail a summary of the dispute to SBpropdoc@ord.uscourts.gov. Pro se plaintiff Leonid P. Krivolenkov present. Andrew T. Weiner present as counsel for defendants. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 12/6/2022.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Fri 11/18 5:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, December 5, 2022 at 3:30 PM in Portland Courtroom 13B before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that the parties confer before the conference. At the conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on Friday, December 2, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 11/21/2022.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
33 33 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 11/01 12:29 PM
Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement Tue 11/01 12:27 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (sb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
31 31 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Fri 10/28 1:22 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 10/28/2022.) (cw)
Related: [-]
30 30 oth_evt Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge Fri 10/28 1:09 PM
Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (kms)
Related: [-]
29 29 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Fri 10/28 11:10 AM
Related: [-]
28 28 discov Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement Fri 10/28 11:10 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/04 8:27 AM
Answer to21 Complaint with Jury Demand. . Filed by Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
26 26 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 09/20 2:47 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko served on 9/13/2022, answer due on 10/4/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 09/20 2:46 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Juan M. Roldan served on 9/13/2022, answer due on 10/4/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 09/20 2:44 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Levi S. Yandell served on 9/13/2022, answer due on 10/4/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
23 23 service Summons Issued Wed 07/20 8:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko. (dino)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 07/12 1:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (dino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
21 21 cmp Complaint Tue 07/12 1:07 PM
Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov against Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (dino)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Order Wed 06/08 3:46 PM
ORDER: Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service13 is GRANTED and the complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff failed to serve an individual authorized by appointment or law to receive service of process on behalf of the defendants. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(2)(C). Motion for Entry of Default8 is DENIED. Motion for Entry of Default16 is DENIED. The Plaintiff has thirty days from the day of this order to refile his complaint if he so choses. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 6/8/2022.) (joha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
19 19 oth_sup Declaration Tue 05/31 4:04 PM
Declaration of Leonid P. Krivolenkov. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. Related [+] (dino)
Related: [-] Response18 .
18 18 oth_ans Response Tue 05/31 4:01 PM
Response. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. Related [+] (dino)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss13 , Response in Opposition to Motion10 .
17 17 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/31 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service by Leonid P. Krivolenkov of Complaint,1 , Summons Issued,3 . Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (dino)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2022
16 16 motion Default Entry Wed 05/25 10:29 AM
Motion for Entry of Default. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
15 15 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/19 4:55 PM
Declaration of Andrew T. Weiner . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss13 .
14 14 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/19 4:54 PM
Declaration of Christina Kempster . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss13 .
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 05/19 4:53 PM
Motion to Dismiss For Insufficient Service . Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/19 4:49 PM
Declaration of Andrew T. Weiner . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Response in Opposition to Motion10 .
11 11 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/19 4:48 PM
Declaration of Christina Kempster . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-] Response in Opposition to Motion10 .
10 10 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/19 4:45 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion for Entry of Default8 . Filed by All Defendants. (Weiner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
9 9 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 05/16 1:12 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Leonid P. Krivolenkov filed a complaint [ECF 1] in this case on March 31, 2022. Summons were issued as to the three defendants. [ECF 3]. On April 19, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Return of Service as to all three defendants. [ECF 4, 5, and 6]. The deadline to answer the complaint was May 10, 2022. No answer was filed. On May 11, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Ent1y of Default [ECF 8]. The Court orders a courtesy copy of Plaintiffs Motion for Ent1y of Default [ECF 8] be sent to the Multnomah County Attorney, Jenny M. Madkour, at 501 SE Hawthorne Boulevard, Suite 500, Portland, Oregon, 97214. The Multnomah County Attorney is requested to respond within 20 days of this order. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Multnomah County and pro se party on 5/16/2022.) (kms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
8 8 motion Default Entry Wed 05/11 10:30 AM
Motion for Entry of Default. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov. (dino)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
7 7 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 05/10 4:42 PM
Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dino)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
6 6 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 04/19 2:53 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko served on 4/15/2022, answer due on 5/6/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 04/19 2:52 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Levi S. Yandell served on 4/15/2022, answer due on 5/6/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Tue 04/19 2:50 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Juan M. Roldan served on 4/15/2022, answer due on 5/6/2022. (dino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/31 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (dino)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 03/31 4:07 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/29/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/29/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 8/29/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/31/2022.) (dino)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/31 4:06 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Receipt No. 97399.Summons issued as to all defendants. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Leonid P. Krivolenkov against Dmitriy Y. Lisichenko, Juan M. Roldan, Levi S. Yandell. (dino)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet