California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:22-cv-02155
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:May 26, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 2:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Amgen
Represented By
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Bryan H Heckenlively
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amgen USA Inc.
Represented By
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Bryan H Heckenlively
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Abraham Benjamin Dyk
Munger Tolles And Olsen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amgen, Inc.
Represented By
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Bryan H Heckenlively
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Abraham Benjamin Dyk
Munger Tolles And Olsen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tia Bush
Represented By
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Bryan H Heckenlively
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Abraham Benjamin Dyk
Munger Tolles And Olsen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edda Colon
Represented By
John W Spiegel
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Bryan H Heckenlively
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Abraham Benjamin Dyk
Munger Tolles And Olsen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Newcombe-Dierl
Represented By
Leonard E. Livshits
Shegerian And Associates Inc.
contact info
Carney R Shegerian
Shegerian And Associates Inc.
contact info
Anthony Nguyen
Shegerian And Associates Inc.
contact info
Mahru Madjidi
Shegerian And Associates Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
59 59 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 01/04 5:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In light of Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal filed on December 9, 2022 [Doc. # 58], the Court hereby DISMISSES this action with prejudice. (lom)
Related: [-]