Scaglione v. Lancaster Central School District
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Arcara |
Referred: | Michael J Roemer |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00713 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 12:40 PM EDT |
Defendant
Lancaster Central School District
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Randolph C. Oppenheimer
|
|
Plaintiff
Gina Scaglione
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/09 12:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gina Scaglione.(Sanders, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 10/06 2:24 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE. Status Conference set for 11/8/2016 10:30 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ) |
||
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 10/06 2:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Status Conference held on 9/21/2016. Discussion held regarding possible settlement. Status conference to be scheduled. Appearances: Harvey P. Sanders, Esq. appearing on behalf of pltf; Brendan P. Kelleher, Esq. appearing on behalf of deft. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (RAZ) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 09/13 1:14 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE. Status Conference re discovery deadline set for 9/21/2016 10:30 AM before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ) |
||
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/08 12:38 PM
THIRD CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Discovery completed by 9/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2016. Mediation To End by 12/15/2016. If no pretrial dispositive motions are filed, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Hon. Richard J. Arcara by December 22, 2016 to schedule a trial date. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 6/7/2016. (RAZ) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/02 11:44 AM
SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Motions to Compel Discovery due by 5/13/2016. Discovery completed by 6/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2016. Mediation To End by 9/15/2016. If no pretrial dispositive motions are filed, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Hon. Richard J. Arcara by September 22, 2016 to schedule a trial date. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/26/2016. (RAZ) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 12/23 4:00 PM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Roemer. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on December 23, 2015. (JMM) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/28 4:00 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2016. If no dispositive motions are filed, a Trial Date Status Conference is set for 4/20/2016 at 09:00AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/28/15. (DAZ) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 10/28 4:01 PM
*** MOTION TERMINATED ***12 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery granted in part and denied in part per13 . (DAZ) |
||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 10/28 12:58 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Case Management Order Deadlines (Brendan P. Kelleher, Esq.) (Filed with permission of Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy).(DAZ) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
adr
Mediation Certification
Tue 08/04 9:43 AM
Mediation Certification by Randolph C. Oppenheimer(Oppenheimer, Randolph) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
adr
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator
Fri 04/03 4:15 PM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Lancaster Central School District. (Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/26 1:26 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Dispositive Motions due by 3/14/2016. In the event no dispositive motions are filed a Trial Date Status Conference is set for 3/17/2016 at 09:30AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/26/15. (DAZ) |
|
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Conference
Wed 02/25 12:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: In Chambers Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2015. Discussed/set Case Management Order deadlines. CMO to follow. APPEARANCES: Harvey P. Sanders for Plaintiff; Brendan Patrick Kelleher for Defendant. (DAZ) |
|
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Thu 02/12 8:54 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling Order by Lancaster Central School District.(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/20 3:38 PM
ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/25/2015 at 10:45 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 1/20/2015. (CMD) |
|
5 | 5
order
Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/20 11:13 AM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 1/20/15. (LAS) |
|
adr
ADR Plan
Tue 01/20 2:33 PM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) |
||
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/16 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Lancaster Central School District.(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/11 5:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Scaglione. Lancaster Central School District waiver sent on 11/12/2014, answer due 1/12/2015.(Sanders, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 28, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Lancaster Central School District. (SG) | |
Case assigned to Hon. Richard J. Arcara. (SG) | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/AO085.pdf (SG) | ||
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT Verified against Gina Scaglione ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2097466.), filed by Gina Scaglione.(Sanders, Harvey) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |