Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:22-cv-00502
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 27, 2022 2:24 AM PDT
Defendant
State of Oregon
Represented By
Jill Conbere
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Tracy Ickes White
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristina Boswell
Represented By
John D. Burgess
Law Offices Of Daniel Snyder
contact info
Daniel J. Snyder
Law Offices Of Daniel Snyder
contact info
Carl Lee Post
Law Offices Of Daniel Snyder
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 22, 2022
15 15 oth_doc Stipulation Mon 08/22 1:57 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal by State of Oregon. Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
14 14 notice Settlement Notice Tue 08/16 8:51 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Order Tue 08/02 3:21 PM
ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines11 is GRANTED. The deadline to complete discovery is extended from July 29, 2022, until October 27, 2022. The deadline for dispositive motions to be filed is extended from July 29, 2022, until November 28, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
12 12 oth_sup Declaration Fri 07/29 4:57 PM
Declaration of Daniel Snyder . Filed by Kristina Boswell. Related [+] (Snyder, Daniel)
Related: [-] Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines11 .
11 11 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Fri 07/29 4:56 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Kristina Boswell. (Snyder, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
10 10 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 07/12 2:04 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting Motion for a Protective Order8 . Signed on 7/12/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/05 4:20 PM
Amended Answer to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses . Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Protective Order Tue 07/05 1:52 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/13 2:33 PM
Answer to1 Complaint . Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 05/03 9:18 AM
ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint5 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended from May 2, 2022, until June 13, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Mon 05/02 3:08 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint1 . Filed by State of Oregon. (White, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 4:41 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to State of Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
3 3 service Proposed Summons Mon 04/04 4:47 PM
Proposed Summons Filed by Kristina Boswell. (Snyder, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 03/31 7:43 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/29/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/29/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 8/29/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/31 5:16 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8465575 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kristina Boswell against State of Oregon. (Snyder, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet