Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04843
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
WESLEY SARTIN
215 ORLEANS
BEAUMONT, TX 77701
Represented By
BRENT WAYNE COON
Brent Coon & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 24 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/12 12:10 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/01 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6895918.), filed by WESLEY SARTIN. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet