Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04852
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ARRON NICHOLS
Brent Coon & Associates 215 Orleans
Beaumont, TX 40983
Represented By
BRENT WAYNE COON
Brent Coon & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 9:20 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/04 8:36 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL, Brent W. Coon - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File, (not 1 Original Proceeding). Also, the parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names shall be formatted using ALL CAPS and no punctuation. Please also note the Jurisdiction is Diversity, Nature of Suit is "365", the Cause of Action is 28:1332pl (28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability). Clerk will reassign judges, correct origin code and party names. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/01 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6896806.), filed by ARRON NICHOLS. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet