California Central District Court
Judge:Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:22-cv-02179
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Terminated:May 10, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 7:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Cedars Business Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Julie Woods
Represented By
Neda Farah
Farah Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 05/10 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Julie Woods. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/22 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Julie Woods. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/04 2:14 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Cedars Business Services, LLC. (rolm)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 04/04 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, April 01, 2022
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/01 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julie Woods, (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 04/01 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Julie Woods. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 04/01 2:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julie Woods. (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/01 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33055864 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Julie Woods. (Attorney Neda Farah added to party Julie Woods(pty:pla))(Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Credit Report