Stern v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-02107 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 1:22-cv-00058 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 6:06 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stern
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 18, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Robert Stern] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Robert Stern] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Robert Stern] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00058. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 04/01 5:31 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of Mississippi, 1:22-cv-00058 Stern v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-02107 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 323 cc: JPMDL (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
Notified IT Department to electronically transfer case to the Northern District of California. (PKS) | ||
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Friday, March 18, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Issued summons emailed to attorney to email address listed on docket. (JCH) | ||
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |