Original Case: 3:19-cv-00193

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-05254
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Terminated:Jan 10, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2023 2:31 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
BLUEGRASS CELLULAR, INC.
Represented By
R. Kenyon Meyer
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Michelle L. Duncan
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CALEB T. BLAND
Represented By
David Thomas Cecil
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Kristen Ann Johnson
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner
contact info
Michael Brian Dailey
O'Bryan, Brown & Toner
contact info
Kyle M. Virgin
McBrayer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BENJAMIN ADKINS
Represented By
Mark A. Osbourn
Bush & Osbourn
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BLAND & BIRDWHISTELL, PLLC
Represented By
David Thomas Cecil
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info
Kyle M. Virgin
McBrayer
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MORGAN RAE PETTY
Represented By
Morgan Rae Petty
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2023 2:31 AM CST
Friday, April 01, 2022
The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Morgan Rae Petty. Transcript needed: n. (RLB)
Related: [-]
LETTER SENT to Ms. Morgan Rae Petty, directing that the enclosed notice of appeal be signed and returned to this court by 04/15/2022. (RLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Unsigned NOA Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs letter sent