New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:22-cv-02754
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Barnes Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Brazo
160 Middle Road Turnpike
Woodbury, CT 06793
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bullock Road Development, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gowans Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peterboro Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Running Creek Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Seaboard Solar Holdings, LLC
143 West Street Suite c201
New Milford, CT 06776
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Selfridge Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stuart Longman
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
VP Road Solar, LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wolcott Hill Road Solar LLC
919 North Market Street Suite 950
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Peter M. Nolin
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Lindsay T Reed
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bullrock Renewables LLC
228 Aviation Avenue Suite 200
South Burlington, VT 05403
Represented By
John B. Simoni, Jr.
Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP
contact info
Scott David Simon
Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
Terminated: 04/28/2022
Represented By
Paul Richard Marino
Day Pitney, L.L.P. (nj)
contact info
Michael J Fitzpatrick
Day Pitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
82 82 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/09 9:39 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Bullrock Renewables LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Simoni, John)
Related: [-]