Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-04880
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:22-cv-00350
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
JASON A CINCILLA
Manning Gross & Massenburg Llp - Wilmington De
contact info
WILLIAM B LARSON, JR
Manning Gross & Massenburg Llp - Wilmington De
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
JASON A CINCILLA
Manning Gross & Massenburg Llp - Wilmington De
contact info
WILLIAM B LARSON, JR
Manning Gross & Massenburg Llp - Wilmington De
contact info
Plaintiff
STEPHEN PRATT
Represented By
MICHAEL C SCHAFLE
Green & Schafle Llc - Philadelphia PA
contact info
JOSEPH JOHN FANTINI
Rosen Injury Lawyers - Jenkintown PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, April 22, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/22 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL C SCHAFLE on behalf of STEPHEN PRATT (SCHAFLE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/22 2:28 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by STEPHEN PRATT. (FANTINI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/22 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH JOHN FANTINI on behalf of STEPHEN PRATT (FANTINI, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 04/04 1:39 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 4/25/2022 .) (Mailed and emailed Attorney Raeann Warner) (djb)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 04/04 1:39 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION #1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement. (Mailed and emailed Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, Raeann Warner) (djb)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 04/04 1:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:22-cv-00350. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/04 12:40 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) in MDL No. 2885 In Re: 3M Combat Arms Earplug Products Liability Litigation. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
6 6 ORDER Granting3 MOTION to Stay filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC -- Case Stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/31/22. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
5 5 VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 3/24/2022. (etg) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include the initials of (VAC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
3 3 MOTION to Stay - filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC.(Luzhatsky, Irina) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Unreported Cases,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 18, 2022
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N22C-02-196 WCC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3828402)- filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC.(twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 4/4/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet