Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:22-cv-01287
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Terminated:Jun 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 8:48 AM EDT
Defendant
APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By
ANDREW M. SCHWARTZ
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
ANDREW WILSON
Represented By
STEPHEN MATTHEW DUNNE
Dunne Law Offices PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, June 27, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/27 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANDREW WILSON (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/10 7:44 PM
NOTICE by APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC re1 Complaint (Attorney),, (Joint Notice of Settlement) (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 04/11 2:05 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including None with Certificate of Service by APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/11 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW M. SCHWARTZ on behalf of APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC with Certificate of Service(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/11 2:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/04 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN MATTHEW DUNNE on behalf of ANDREW WILSON (DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 04/04 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15833263.), filed by ANDREW WILSON.(DUNNE, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - The July 16, 2021, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's December 28, 2021, TransUnion credit report,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - The December 28, 2021, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 8 Designation Form
service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 8:08 AM
Summons Issued as to APEX ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 4/4/22 (dt)
Related: [-]