17
|
|
17
order
Close Dismissed Case (BK Cases Only)
Tue 05/17 8:56 AM
Order to Close Dismissed Case. Signed on 5/17/2022 (one)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 05/17 8:58 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (one)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Generic Order
Tue 05/03 1:53 PM
Order Discharging Trustee; Salvatore LaMonica as Subchapter V Trustee of the above captioned estate be and hereby is discharged Related [+]. Signed on 5/3/2022 (one)
|
15
|
|
15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal
Sat 04/23 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 04/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
trustee
Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd
Wed 04/20 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 0 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Salvatore LaMonica Esq.. (LaMonica, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
order
Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Wed 04/20 11:53 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 4/20/2022 (one)
|
12
|
|
12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/09 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing
Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 04/07 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
trustee
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions
Tue 04/05 4:42 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 25, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by United States Trustee. (Birmingham, William)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 04/05 4:31 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/25/2022 at 02:00 PM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (hrm)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 04/05 4:15 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Salvatore LaMonica . Salvatore LaMonica, Esq. added to the case. 341 Meeting Date Scheduled for 4/25/22 at 2:00 p.m., at Room 562 Filed by United States Trustee.(Black, Christine)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Verified Statement by SubChapter V trustee
|
4
|
|
4
order
Generic Order
Tue 04/05 1:43 PM
Order on Defective or Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Non-Individual; To cure this deficiency, the debtor's attorney must file a notice of appearance with the court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order; If the deficiency is not cured within fourteen days, the case may be dismissed thereafter without further notice Related [+]. Signed on 4/5/2022 (one)
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Tue 04/05 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1000.00. Receipt Number 265348. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Tue 04/05 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $738.00. Receipt Number 265349. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman
Mon 04/04 4:44 PM
Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman. (hrm)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Mon 04/04 4:32 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/1/2022.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/1/2022. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/1/2022. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/1/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/1/2022. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 4/8/2022. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 4/8/2022. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 4/8/2022. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 4/8/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/15/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/15/2022. Schedule A/B due 4/15/2022. Schedule D due 4/15/2022. Schedule E/F due 4/15/2022. Schedule G due 4/15/2022. Schedule H due 4/15/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/15/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/15/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 4/15/2022. (hrm)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 04/04 3:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 6/30/2022. (hrm) Modified on 4/4/2022 (srm)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman
Mon 04/04 4:38 PM
Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsmandue by 5/4/2022 Related [+] (hrm)
|