New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:22-bk-70642
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Dismissed:Apr 20, 2022
Terminated:May 17, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc
464 E Main St
Patchogue, NY 11772-3106
Represented By
All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
17 17 order Close Dismissed Case (BK Cases Only) Tue 05/17 8:56 AM
Order to Close Dismissed Case. Signed on 5/17/2022 (one)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 05/17 8:58 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (one)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
16 16 order Generic Order Tue 05/03 1:53 PM
Order Discharging Trustee; Salvatore LaMonica as Subchapter V Trustee of the above captioned estate be and hereby is discharged Related [+]. Signed on 5/3/2022 (one)
Related: [-] 14 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution - case dismissed or converted, fee award not received filed by Trustee Salvatore LaMonica
Friday, April 22, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Sat 04/23 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 04/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
14 14 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Wed 04/20 2:13 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 0 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Salvatore LaMonica Esq.. (LaMonica, Salvatore)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Wed 04/20 11:53 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 4/20/2022 (one)
Related: [-] 4 Generic Order
Friday, April 08, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Sat 04/09 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Fri 04/08 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 04/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Thu 04/07 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
7 7 trustee Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions Tue 04/05 4:42 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for April 25, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by United States Trustee. (Birmingham, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 04/05 4:31 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/25/2022 at 02:00 PM at Room 562, 560 Federal Plaza, CI, NY. (hrm)
Related: [-]
5 5 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Tue 04/05 4:15 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Salvatore LaMonica . Salvatore LaMonica, Esq. added to the case. 341 Meeting Date Scheduled for 4/25/22 at 2:00 p.m., at Room 562 Filed by United States Trustee.(Black, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement by SubChapter V trustee
4 4 order Generic Order Tue 04/05 1:43 PM
Order on Defective or Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Non-Individual; To cure this deficiency, the debtor's attorney must file a notice of appearance with the court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order; If the deficiency is not cured within fourteen days, the case may be dismissed thereafter without further notice Related [+]. Signed on 4/5/2022 (one)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 04/05 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1000.00. Receipt Number 265348. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 04/05 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $738.00. Receipt Number 265349. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
3 3 court Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Mon 04/04 4:44 PM
Request to Chambers Re: Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman. (hrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Mon 04/04 4:32 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/1/2022.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/1/2022. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/1/2022. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/1/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/1/2022. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 4/8/2022. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 4/8/2022. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 4/8/2022. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 4/8/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/15/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/15/2022. Schedule A/B due 4/15/2022. Schedule D due 4/15/2022. Schedule E/F due 4/15/2022. Schedule G due 4/15/2022. Schedule H due 4/15/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/15/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/15/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 4/15/2022. (hrm)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/04 3:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 6/30/2022. (hrm) Modified on 4/4/2022 (srm)
Related: [-]
court Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman Mon 04/04 4:38 PM
Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsmandue by 5/4/2022 Related [+] (hrm)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor All Pro Medical Supplies, Inc