New York Northern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Stewart
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 8:22-cv-00314
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 12:16 PM EDT
Cross Claimant
Dick White
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Claimant
Bette & Cring Construction Group, LLC
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Claimant
Matthew Bette
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Claimant
Patrick Gebbie
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Claimant
John Doe
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Claimant
John O'Neil
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
O'Neil Contracting, Bloomingdale, New York
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Sherri Rugar
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Matthew Bette
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Village of Lake Placid
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Bette & Cring Construction Group, LLC
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Janet Bliss
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Thomas Broderick
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
James Brooks
Represented By
Dennis A. First
O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Elizabeth J. Grogan
O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jodi Burke
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Shawn Burke
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Burke Excavation Demolition, Inc., ABN: Jeda Environmental, Massena, New York
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Art Devlin
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Anita Estling
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
O'Neil Contracting, Bloomingdale, New York
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Patrick Gebbie
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Brad Hathaway
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Peter Holderied
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jack Rugar Custom Painting, Keeseville, New York
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jack Rugar
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jason Leon
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Michael Maher
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Northwood School, Lake Placid, New York
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Cross Defendant
Craig Randall
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
John O'Neil
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Dick White
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Dick White
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Bette
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Bette & Cring Construction Group, LLC
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Janet Bliss
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Broderick
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Defendant
James Brooks
Represented By
Dennis A. First
O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Elizabeth J. Grogan
O'Connor, O'Connor Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Defendant
Jodi Burke
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Burke
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Burke Excavation Demolition, Inc., ABN: Jeda Environmental, Massena, New York
Represented By
Daniel Cartwright
Kenney Shelton Liptak Nowak LLP
contact info
Defendant
Art Devlin
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Anita Estling
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Gebbie
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Brad Hathaway
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Peter Holderied
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jack Rugar Custom Painting, Keeseville, New York
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Andrea P. Demers
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd LLP
contact info
Steven V. DeBraccio
Burke, Scolamiero & Hurd, LLP
contact info
Kevin P. Burke
Burke, Scolamiero Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jason Leon
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Maher
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Northwood School, Lake Placid, New York
Represented By
Scott D. Kagan
Hurwitz Fine P.C. - Buffalo Office
contact info
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Defendant
John O'Neil
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
O'Neil Contracting, Bloomingdale, New York
Represented By
Daniel P. Fletcher
Costello, Cooney & Fearon, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Craig Randall
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jack Rugar
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Sherri Rugar
Represented By
Justin R. Meyer
Stafford, Owens Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Village of Lake Placid
Represented By
April J. Laws
Johnson Laws, LLC
contact info
Nicole Christine Haddadnia
Johnson & Laws LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Hughes
Represented By
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham
contact info
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf & Cunningham Llc - Buffalo Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Fletcher
Represented By
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham
contact info
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf & Cunningham Llc - Buffalo Office
contact info

GPO Mar 10 2023
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to file an amended complaint (Dkt. No. 43) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs must file their proposed Amended Complaint in accordance with Local Rule 15.1(c); and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 43) is DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 25); (Dkt. No. 27); (Dkt. No. 34); and (Dkt. No. 36) are DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. No. 38) is DENIED as moot; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 3/10/2023. (dpk)
GPO Dec 11 2023
nnes on 12/11/2023. (nmk)MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Village Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 65) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Randall, Devlin, Holderied, Leon, Bliss, Estling, and Hathaway are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the following claims may proceed: 1) Plaintiffs' Section 1983 claim against the Village of Lake Placid for municipal liability; and 2) Plaintiff Fletcher's Title II ADA disability discrimination claim against the Village of Lake Placid, all as discussed herein. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 73) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the Northwood Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 74) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' federal claims against the Northwood Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Brooks's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 76) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' federal claims against Defendant Brooks are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Burke Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 80) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' federal claims against the Burke Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Bette & Cring Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 82) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' federal claims against the Bette & Cring Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the O'Neil Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. 105) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' federal claims against the O'Neil Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state law trespass and private nuisance claims against the Northwood Defendants, Defendant Brooks, the Burke Defendants, the Bette & Cring Defendants and the O'Neil Defendants, and those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice as to those Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sa

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 6:06 AM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
156 156 notice Notice - Other Thu 02/27 5:47 PM
NOTICE re 155 Order on Letter Request - Counsel is advised that no further extensions will be allowed. (spl)
Related: [-]
155 155 order Order on Letter Request Thu 02/27 5:45 PM
TEXT ORDER granting153 Letter Request to extend the following deadlines: Discovery due by 9/1/2025; Defendant Expert Disclosure Deadline is 5/13/2025; Motions to be filed by 10/28/2025; Plaintiff deadline to obtain report of medical expert is 6/26/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/27/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
154 154 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jenna M. Wojdan-Price on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wojdan-Price, Jenna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
153 153 motion Letter Request/Motion Sat 02/22 10:56 AM
Letter Motion from Counsel for Plaintiffs for Wendy Fletcher, James Hughes requesting Extension to Deadlines in Scheduling Order submitted to Judge Daniel Stewart . (Davenport, Chad)
Related: [-]