New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:22-cv-02769
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Terminated:Dec 02, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Oct 01, 2022 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions
Represented By
Chelsea Getz
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Shmuel Schwartz
Represented By
Rachel Kugel
Rachel Kugel, Esq.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)
Terminated: 09/09/2022
Represented By
Christopher Barry Turcotte
Turcotte Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, December 02, 2022
30 30 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Fri 12/02 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY REQUESTED by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney, that the above-entitled action against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, shall be dismissed with prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party and that a judgment of dismissal with prejudice may be entered in the above-entitled action pursuant hereto. Because both Plaintiff and Defendant Experian Information Solutions have consented to this voluntary dismissal with prejudice, and because Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank has already been dismissed, this case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/2/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/01 11:04 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge John P. Cronan for approval for the following reason(s): the notice of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/30 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Experian Information Solutions. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 11/29 9:03 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Rachel Kugel. RE-FILE Document No. 28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the notice of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/28 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Experian Information Solutions. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
27 27 order Memo Endorsement Tue 10/25 2:03 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter filed by Shmuel Schwartz. ENDORSEMENT By November 28, 2022, the parties shall submit a stipulation or proposed order of dismissal or, in the alternative, an additional status letter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/25/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
26 26 misc Letter Mon 10/24 11:51 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from joint parties dated 10/24/22 re: Settlement Update. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/17 4:24 PM
ORDER By October 24, 2022, the parties shall either file a Notice of Dismissal or submit a status letter informing the Court of whether a final settlement has been reached and, if so, whether it is necessary for the Court to retain jurisdiction over this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/17/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
24 24 order Memo Endorsement Wed 09/21 12:32 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Notice of Settlement filed by Shmuel Schwartz. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pre-trial conference scheduled for September 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/21/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 09/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
21 21 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 09/09 10:55 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO CHASE ONLY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiff Shmuel Schwartz ("Schwartz") and defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ("Chase") that, pursuant to FRCP 41 (a), all of the claims by Schwm1z against Chase in the captioned matter are hereby discontinued in their entirety, with prejudice, and without costs to any party. In light of Plaintiff and Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank's stipulation of dismissal, this action is dismissed as to Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank from the docket. SO ORDERED. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB) terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 9/8/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/08 11:37 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 20 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge John P. Cronan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/07 9:13 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB) and without costs. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB). Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error Wed 09/07 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Christopher Turcotte to RE-FILE Document 19 Proposed Stipulation and Order. Use the event type Other Filings, Other Documents, Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
19 19 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 09/06 5:15 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
18 18 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/30 10:51 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter filed by Shmuel Schwartz. ENDORSEMENT: Because the Court is unavailable at 1:00 p.m. on September 27, 2022, the initial pre-trial conference in this case is adjourned until September 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. At that time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/29/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
17 17 misc Letter Fri 08/26 10:14 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Rachel Kugel, Esq. dated 8/25/22 re: request to adj. IPTC. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 07/28 2:47 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 9/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
16 16 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 06/27 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/27/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 06/27 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/27/2022.(ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
15 15 order Mediation Referral Order Wed 06/22 5:48 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/5/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/22/2022) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/21 5:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/21 5:44 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB). Document filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/10 12:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions..(Getz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/10 12:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions..(Getz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/10 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chelsea Getz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions..(Getz, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/12 12:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/11 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB) waiver sent on 4/22/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/11 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Barry Turcotte on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB)..(Turcotte, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 9:42 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB). (vf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/05 9:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 04/05 9:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 04/05 9:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 04/05 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/04 4:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB), re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/04 4:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/04 4:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/04 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank (JPMCB), Experian Information Solutions. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25958331)Document filed by Shmuel Schwartz..(Kugel, Rachel)
Related: [-]