Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-bcaag-01594
Typebca or pto / patent trial and appeal board
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2022
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 18, 2022 7:18 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae
THOMAS CECH
Represented By
Joshua Day
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ginger Anders
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Heather E. Takahashi
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
TITIA DE LANGE
Represented By
Joshua Day
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ginger Anders
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Heather E. Takahashi
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
MICHAEL S. LEVINE
Represented By
Joshua Day
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ginger Anders
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Heather E. Takahashi
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
DAVID JAY SEGAL
Represented By
Joshua Day
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ginger Anders
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Heather E. Takahashi
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Amicus Curiae
JACK W. SZOSTAK
Represented By
Joshua Day
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Ginger Anders
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Heather E. Takahashi
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Appellant
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lamken
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Sara Margolis
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Jonathan E. Barbee
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Kathleen Clarke
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Kenneth E. Notter III
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Appellant
UNIVERSITY OF VIENNA
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lamken
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Sara Margolis
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Jonathan E. Barbee
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Kathleen Clarke
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Kenneth E. Notter III
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Appellant
EMMANUELLE CHARPENTIER
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Lamken
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Sara Margolis
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Jonathan E. Barbee
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Kathleen Clarke
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Kenneth E. Notter III
MoloLamken LLP
contact info
Cross-Appellant
THE BROAD INSTITUTE, INC.
Represented By
Raymond Nimrod
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Hugh S. Balsam
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Steven R. Trybus
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Robson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Cross-Appellant
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By
Raymond Nimrod
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Hugh S. Balsam
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Steven R. Trybus
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Robson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Cross-Appellant
PRESIDENT AND FELLOWS OF HARVARD COLLEGE
Represented By
Raymond Nimrod
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Hugh S. Balsam
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Steven R. Trybus
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Matthew D. Robson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Movant
REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
Roy T. Englert Jr.
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Jason A. Shaffer
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info
Irena Royzman
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/18/2022 7:18 AM EDT
Monday, April 04, 2022
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/30/2022. [840636] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/18/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/18/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/18/2022. Certified List is due on 05/16/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 04/04/2022 11:46 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 214 pgs Agency Case Docketed