Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Gustafson
Case #: 3:22-bk-30454
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Dec 06, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Jun 28, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
My Love of Care Home Health Services LLC
PO Box 225
Quincy, OH 43343-0225
Represented By
Steven L. Diller
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
63 63 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/06 10:37 AM
Final Decree Issued. Case Closed. (mknei)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
62 62 BNC Notice of Order on Motion For Final Decree Sat 12/03 12:11 AM
Notice of Order on Motion For Final Decree w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 61
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
61 61 order Final Decree Wed 11/30 11:59 AM
Order of Final Decree and Case Closing (RE #56 ) Signed on 11/30/2022. (mknei crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
60 60 court Proceeding Memo Tue 11/29 3:10 PM
Proceeding Memo: Hearing held. No opposition to the Motion for Final Decree. Granted. Related [+] (mknei)
Related: [-] 56 Final Decree